Holland Home Loans Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429046158789) was incorporated on 06 Jun 2017. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 5 Te Kio Crescent, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 (type: physical, service). 8 Lulu Ave, Chartwell, Hamilton had been their registered address, until 17 Oct 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Holland, Carly Hinerangi (an individual) located at Papamoa Beach, Papamoa postcode 3118. "Mortgage broking service" (business classification K641930) is the category the ABS issued Holland Home Loans Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 101, Waikato Mail Centre, Hamilton, 3240 | Postal | 11 Apr 2022 |
67 Norton Road, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Office & delivery | 11 Apr 2022 |
5 Te Kio Crescent, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 | Physical & service & registered | 17 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Carly Hinerangi Deller
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 06 Jun 2017
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 09 Oct 2019 |
Director | 06 Jun 2017 - current |
Carly Hinerangi Holland
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 28 Mar 2023
Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 09 Oct 2019 |
Director | 06 Jun 2017 - current |
67 Norton Road , Frankton , Hamilton , 3204 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Lulu Ave, Chartwell, Hamilton, 3281 | Registered | 11 May 2021 - 17 Oct 2022 |
8 Lulu Avenue, Chartwell, Hamilton, 3281 | Physical | 11 May 2021 - 17 Oct 2022 |
11b Somerset Street, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical & registered | 07 Nov 2018 - 11 May 2021 |
33 Bellmont Avenue, Chartwell, Hamilton, 3210 | Registered & physical | 06 Jun 2017 - 07 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holland, Carly Hinerangi Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
19 May 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Deller, Carly Hinerangi Director |
Chartwell Hamilton 3210 |
06 Jun 2017 - 19 May 2020 |
Mlpd Early Learning Limited 128 Bankwood Road |
|
Kukutaruhe Education Trust Board C/o Fairfield College |
|
Peace And Tranquility Healers Trust 13 Tongariro Street |
|
NZ City Contracting Limited 11 Tongariro Street |
|
Autos Private Limited 145 Bankwood Road |
|
Susanne's Tax Agency Limited 47 Tongariro Street |
Waikato Mortgage And Life Brokers Limited 7a Princes Street |
Dawning NZ Limited 19 Arista Way |
Slowrider Limited 13 Hampshire Court |
Ihome Mortgage Broker Limited 3 Wishbone Court |
Resolva Limited 24 Te Huia Drive |
New Zealand Home Loans South Waikato Limited 27 Helen June Avenue |