Treble Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429046212078) was incorporated on 04 Jul 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 257 Upper Waiwera Road, Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994 (type: registered, physical). Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 11 Jul 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 95 shares (95% of shares), namely:
Pedersen, Kristin Mary (a director) located at Rd 1, Silverdale postcode 0994. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 5% of all shares (5 shares); it includes
Flyger, Stuart John (a director) - located at Rd 1, Silverdale. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the classification the ABS issued to Treble Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
257 Upper Waiwera Road, Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Jul 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kristin Mary Pedersen
Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994
Address used since 04 Jul 2017 |
Director | 04 Jul 2017 - current |
Stuart John Flyger
Rd 1, Silverdale, 0994
Address used since 04 Jul 2017 |
Director | 04 Jul 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 10 Jul 2019 - 11 Jul 2022 |
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 04 Jul 2017 - 10 Jul 2019 |
Level 29, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 04 Jul 2017 - 11 Jul 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pedersen, Kristin Mary Director |
Rd 1 Silverdale 0994 |
04 Jul 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Flyger, Stuart John Director |
Rd 1 Silverdale 0994 |
04 Jul 2017 - current |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Hirner Properties No.2 Limited Level 14, 41 Shortland Street |
Florents Limited Level 7, 55 Shortland Street |
Shannon Properties 2013 Limited Level 7, 55 Shortland Street |
Ocean Operations Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
Armata Property Limited Level 7, 55 Shortland Street |
Tha Investments Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |