Tonka Contracting Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429046328472) was registered on 30 Aug 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 (type: registered, physical). 123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke had been their registered address, up to 07 Mar 2022. 120 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 20 shares (16.67% of shares), namely:
Burgess, Taneesha Renee (an individual) located at Rd 9, Paengaroa postcode 3189. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 83.33% of all shares (100 shares); it includes
Beaufoy, Matt Angus (a director) - located at Rd 8, Te Puke. "Excavating services" (business classification E321240) is the classification the ABS issued to Tonka Contracting Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Matt Angus Beaufoy
Rd 8, Te Puke, 3188
Address used since 03 Feb 2023
Rd 9, Paengaroa, 3189
Address used since 25 Feb 2022
Matamata, 3473
Address used since 04 Dec 2020
Wanaka, 9305
Address used since 30 Aug 2017
Mangapapa, Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 01 Apr 2019 |
Director | 30 Aug 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 | Registered & physical | 26 Mar 2021 - 07 Mar 2022 |
123 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 | Registered & physical | 25 Mar 2021 - 26 Mar 2021 |
194 Tauranga Road, Matamata, 3473 | Registered & physical | 14 Dec 2020 - 25 Mar 2021 |
19 Mary Street, Mangapapa, Gisborne, 4010 | Registered & physical | 31 May 2019 - 14 Dec 2020 |
Level 2, 45 Camp Street, Queenstown, 9300 | Physical & registered | 30 Aug 2017 - 31 May 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burgess, Taneesha Renee Individual |
Rd 9 Paengaroa 3189 |
05 Mar 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Beaufoy, Matt Angus Director |
Rd 8 Te Puke 3188 |
30 Aug 2017 - current |
Cardrona Enterprises Limited 1st Floor, Chester Bldg |
|
Darkside Media Limited 10 Memorial Street |
|
Small Planet Recycling Limited 17 Shotover Street |
|
Domain Road Water Supply Limited Chester Building |
|
Housemart Limited Chester Building |
|
Monaghan Land Holdings Limited The Station |
Monk Earthworks Limited Level 1 |
B & A Digging Limited 2210 Gibbston Highway |
Riverview Contracting Limited 1009 Luggate-cromwell Road |
Earnscleugh Contracting Limited 71 Hanning Road |
Wilfox Limited 4134 Roxburgh-ettrick Road |
Lindsay Ewing Contracting Limited 160 Spey Street |