Fe Sports Nz Limited (issued a business number of 9429046464941) was registered on 17 Nov 2017. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 04 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 33 shares (33 per cent of shares), namely:
B&K Holdings Qld Pty Ltd (an other) located at Seventeen Mile Rocks Qld postcode 4073. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33 per cent of all shares (exactly 33 shares); it includes
Brkic, Keren Louise (an individual) - located at Chapel Hill Qld. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (34 shares, 34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Brkic, Branko, located at Chapel Hill Qld (a director). "Bicycle and accessory retailing" (business classification G424110) is the category the ABS issued Fe Sports Nz Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 13 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Branko Brkic
Chapel Hill Qld, 4069
Address used since 17 Nov 2017
Woollongabba Qld, 4102
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 17 Nov 2017 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Floor 8 Harbourview Building, 152 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 07 Aug 2020 - 04 Sep 2020 |
Suite 9, Level 6, 203 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 26 Feb 2020 - 07 Aug 2020 |
Suite 817, Level 8, West Plaza Building, 3 Albert Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 04 Nov 2019 - 26 Feb 2020 |
Floor 26, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 29 May 2019 - 04 Nov 2019 |
Floor 27, 188 Quay Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 18 Jun 2018 - 29 May 2019 |
68 Russell Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 | Registered & physical | 17 Nov 2017 - 18 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
B&k Holdings Qld Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
Seventeen Mile Rocks Qld 4073 |
17 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brkic, Keren Louise Individual |
Chapel Hill Qld 4069 |
17 Nov 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Brkic, Branko Director |
Chapel Hill Qld 4069 |
17 Nov 2017 - current |
Neuren Trustee Limited Lowndes Jordan, Level 15 Pwc Tower |
|
Industrial And Commercial Bank Of China (new Zealand) Limited Level 11 |
|
Westcott Trustee Limited 188 |
|
Klouwens Trustee Limited Level 20 |
|
Vernon Quoi Trustee Company Limited Level 20 |
|
Newbranch Limited 188 Quay Street |
Vbike Limited 23 Westhaven Drive |
Bicyclette Limited 58 College Hill Road |
Electric Bike Team Limited 29 East St Eden Terrace |
Joytime Trading Limited 145 Khyber Pass Road |
Cyco NZ Limited 348 New North Road |
Cycle Service Limited 2 Tui Street |