Tal 67 Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429046832276) was launched on 08 Jun 2018. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). 222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 11 May 2022. 1 share is allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Tal Nominee Limited (an entity) located at Albany, Auckland postcode 0632. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued to Tal 67 Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 11 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 11 May 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Scott Phillips
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 08 Jun 2018 |
Director | 08 Jun 2018 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
222 Dairy Flat Highway, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 08 Jun 2018 - 11 May 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tal Nominee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047636897 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Albany Auckland 0632 |
17 Sep 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Phillips, Richard Scott Director |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
08 Jun 2018 - 17 Sep 2019 |
Federal Imports Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway 17 |
|
Society Marketing Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
L Spooner Trustee Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Pistorius Fleming Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Tal 62 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
|
Atf Te Atatu Peninsula Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Tal 62 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Tal 63 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Tal64 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Tal 66 Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Trustee Advisors No. 3 Limited Unit 1,222 Dairy Flat Highway |
Lsf Trustee Limited Unit 1, 222 Dairy Flat Highway |