B F Honan Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429000008693) was registered on 25 Jul 1988. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 (type: physical, service). 21E Norman Spencer Drive, Papatoetoe, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 12 Aug 2020. 1000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 999 shares (99.9% of shares), namely:
R B A Trustees (2021) Limited (an entity) located at Papakura, Papakura postcode 2110,
Honan, Suzanne Norma (an individual) located at Papakura, Papakura postcode 2110,
Honan, Barrington Francis (an individual) located at Papakura, Papakura postcode 2110. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Honan, Barrington Francis (an individual) - located at Papakura, Papakura. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 21 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, Papakura, 2110 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Barrington Francis Honan
Papakura, Papakura, 2110
Address used since 01 Aug 2015 |
Director | 15 Nov 1988 - current |
Russell Alan Bixley
R D 2, Pukekohe,
Address used since 15 Nov 1988 |
Director | 15 Nov 1988 - 03 Jun 1997 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
21e Norman Spencer Drive, Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2104 | Physical & registered | 14 Aug 2014 - 12 Aug 2020 |
C/- Robertson Humphreys & Co, Cnr East & Wood Street, Papakura | Physical | 24 Mar 1998 - 24 Mar 1998 |
19 G Norman Spencer Drive, Papatoetoe, Auckland | Physical & registered | 24 Mar 1998 - 14 Aug 2014 |
11a Norman Spencer Drive, Papatoetoe | Registered | 24 Mar 1998 - 24 Mar 1998 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
R B A Trustees (2021) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049292015 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
20 Jul 2021 - current |
Honan, Suzanne Norma Individual |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
25 Jul 1988 - current |
Honan, Barrington Francis Individual |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
25 Jul 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Honan, Barrington Francis Individual |
Papakura Papakura 2110 |
25 Jul 1988 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bixley, Russell Alan Individual |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
25 Jul 1988 - 20 Jul 2021 |
Wheelchocks Limited 21 Norman Spencer Drive |
|
Keelguard Limited 21 Norman Spencer Drive,manukau City |
|
Rubbermark Industries Limited 21 Norman Spencer Drive |
|
J.m. Store (new Zealand) Pty Limited 1 Mepal Place |
|
J & J Clothing Limited 11 Mepal Place |
|
Chengzhen Temple Incorporated 11 Mepal Place |