Blue Mountain Nurseries Limited (issued a business number of 9429000068659) was started on 25 Mar 1999. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 15A Hokonui Drive, Gore (type: registered, physical). O'connor Richmond, 15A Hokonui Drive, Gore had been their registered address, until 28 Sep 2006. 1000 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 250 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Hughes, Christopher Frank (an individual) located at Tapanui. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 37.5% of all shares (exactly 375 shares); it includes
Hughes, Denis Frank (an individual) - located at Tapanui. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (375 shares, 37.5%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Hughes, Christopher Frank, located at Tapanui (an individual),
Haigh, Elizabeth Shirley, located at Dunedin, Otago (an individual),
Hughes, Janice Margaret, located at Wanaka (an individual). The Businesscheck database was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
O'connor Richmond, 15a Hokonui Drive, Gore | Service & physical | 26 Mar 1999 |
15a Hokonui Drive, Gore | Registered | 28 Sep 2006 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Frank Hughes
Tapanui, Tapanui, 9522
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 25 Mar 1999 - current |
Denis Frank Hughes
Tapanui, Tapanui, 9522
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 25 Mar 1999 - current |
Margaret Loreen Hughes
Tapanui,
Address used since 25 Mar 1999 |
Director | 25 Mar 1999 - 19 Aug 2008 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
O'connor Richmond, 15a Hokonui Drive, Gore | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 28 Sep 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes, Christopher Frank Individual |
Tapanui |
25 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes, Denis Frank Individual |
Tapanui |
25 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes, Christopher Frank Individual |
Tapanui |
25 Mar 1999 - current |
Haigh, Elizabeth Shirley Individual |
Dunedin Otago 9010 |
08 Sep 2009 - current |
Hughes, Janice Margaret Individual |
Wanaka |
08 Sep 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes, Margaret Loreen Individual |
Tapanui |
25 Mar 1999 - 08 Sep 2009 |
Mcclintock Contracting Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
C & T Scoles Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Avonmac Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Matthew Gardyne Engineering Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
Scott Innovation Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |
|
P J & B D Rutherford Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |