Glenrannoch Trustees Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030127999) was incorporated on 24 Jul 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, physical). 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 21 Sep 2017. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Stewart, Christopher John (an individual) located at Dipton postcode 9791. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Glenrannoch Trustees Limited. Our database was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Sep 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Frazer Clive Weir
Rd 5, Christchurch, 7675
Address used since 24 Jul 2013 |
Director | 24 Jul 2013 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 14 Jul 2017 - 21 Sep 2017 |
30 Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 24 Jul 2013 - 14 Jul 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stewart, Christopher John Individual |
Dipton 9791 |
24 Jul 2013 - current |
Kitz Investments Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Roading And Building Cartage Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Weir Nominees Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
|
Mackay Trustees 2013 Limited 287 - 293 Durham Street |
|
L & P Build Limited 287-293 Durham Street North, Christchurch Central |
|
Tai Tapu Milk Company Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
Dwsl Holdings Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
Hoglett Hamlet Limited 141 Cambridge Terrace |
Squeakidin Limited 141 Cambridge Terrace |
Mole Hill Limited 141 Cambridge Terrace |
Provence Investments Limited 85 Hereford Street |
Udone Investments Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |