Quartz Cafe Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030225817) was incorporated on 13 May 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 245 Seaforth Road, Waihi Beach, 3611 (type: registered, physical). 109 Main Road, Katikati had been their registered address, until 17 Nov 2015. 100 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Fowler-Oates, Gillian Leah (a director) located at Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach postcode 3611,
Oates, Michael Dennis (an individual) located at Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach postcode 3611. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Oates, Michael Dennis (an individual) - located at Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Fowler-Oates, Gillian Leah, located at Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach (a director). "Cafe operation" (business classification H451110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Quartz Cafe Limited. Our data was updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
245 Seaforth Road, Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611 | Service & physical | 13 May 2013 |
245 Seaforth Road, Waihi Beach, 3611 | Registered | 17 Nov 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gillian Leah Fowler-oates
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 13 May 2013 |
Director | 13 May 2013 - current |
Nyssa Leah Fowler-oates
Waihi Beach, Waihi Beach, 3611
Address used since 13 May 2013 |
Director | 13 May 2013 - 25 Nov 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
109 Main Road, Katikati, 3129 | Registered | 03 Dec 2014 - 17 Nov 2015 |
26 Fourth Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered | 13 May 2013 - 03 Dec 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fowler-oates, Gillian Leah Director |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - current |
Oates, Michael Dennis Individual |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Oates, Michael Dennis Individual |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fowler-oates, Gillian Leah Director |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ag Trustee 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035249894 Company Number: 1541221 Entity |
13 May 2013 - 02 Nov 2016 | |
Nyssa Leah Fowler-oates Director |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - 28 Nov 2014 |
Ag Trustee 2011 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035249894 Company Number: 1541221 Entity |
13 May 2013 - 02 Nov 2016 | |
Fowler-oates, Nyssa Leah Individual |
Waihi Beach Waihi Beach 3611 |
13 May 2013 - 28 Nov 2014 |
Owens Flooring Limited 236 Seaforth Road |
|
Nana Investment Holdings Limited 211 Seaforth Road |
|
Shiv Ravji & Co. Limited 211 Seaforth Road |
|
Payneless Accounting Systems Limited 35 Hanlen Avenue |
|
Pauashell Rentals Limited 27 Hanlen Avenue |
|
Rauaroha Trustee Limited 86 Koutunui Road |
The Surf Shack (waihi Beach) Limited 123 Emerton Road |
The Platter Board Limited 194a Heard Road |
J.a.k.s Holdings Limited 109 Main Road |
The Old Gold Refinery Limited 5 Willoughby Street |
Maru Sushi & Cafe Limited 56 Belmont Road |
Whanga Sub Limited 601 Port Road |