Voltex Electrical Limited (NZBN 9429030335165) was incorporated on 25 Feb 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 2 Daniel Place, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 (type: physical, registered). Level 1, 2 Daniel Place, Te Rapa, Hamilton had been their physical address, up until 18 Nov 2020. Voltex Electrical Limited used more aliases, namely: Electroquip Group Limited from 22 Feb 2013 to 14 Sep 2018. 3000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 3000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Acn 633504131 - Voltex Holdings Pty Limited (an other) located at Old Reynella, South Australia postcode 5161. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Daniel Place, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & registered & service | 18 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Duncan Gibbs
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 25 Mar 2019
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 12 Aug 2015
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 17 Jul 2018 |
Director | 25 Feb 2013 - current |
Robert Gibbs
Flagstaff, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 09 Nov 2020 |
Director | 09 Nov 2020 - current |
Gregory James Tunley
Springfield, South Australia, 5062
Address used since 13 Jul 2022 |
Director | 13 Jul 2022 - current |
Bryan Stewart Tunley
Eden Hills, South Australia, 5050
Address used since 13 Jul 2022 |
Director | 13 Jul 2022 - current |
Denys George Gibbs
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 03 Aug 2017
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 12 Aug 2015 |
Director | 25 Feb 2013 - 10 Nov 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 2 Daniel Place, Te Rapa, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & registered | 24 Aug 2020 - 18 Nov 2020 |
11 Hardley Street, Whitiora, Hamilton, 3200 | Physical & registered | 19 Dec 2014 - 24 Aug 2020 |
37 Lake Road, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 25 Feb 2013 - 19 Dec 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Acn 633504131 - Voltex Holdings Pty Limited Other (Other) |
Old Reynella South Australia 5161 |
12 Sep 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gibbs, Lynda Jane Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
29 Apr 2021 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Adrian David Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Robert Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Robert Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Robert Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Duncan Director |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Laura Deborah Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
29 Apr 2021 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Joanna Evelyn Individual |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 |
29 Apr 2021 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Robert Individual |
Flagstaff Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Duncan Director |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Duncan Director |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Duncan Director |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Adrian David Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Adrian David Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Adrian David Individual |
Queenwood Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 12 Sep 2022 |
Gibbs, Denys George Individual |
Rototuna Hamilton 3210 |
25 Feb 2013 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Dunport Enterprises Limited 11 Hardley Street |
|
Altan Limited 11 Hardley Street |
|
Agility Holdings Limited 11 Hardley Street |
|
Waikato Orthopaedics Limited 11 Hardley Street |
|
Jrb Ag Services Limited 11 Hardley Street |
|
Areare Bloodstock Limited 11 Hardley Street |