Not Just Books Limited (issued a business number of 9429030345065) was launched on 15 Feb 2013. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 44 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 (type: registered, physical). 44 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson had been their physical address, up to 17 Feb 2016. 300 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 114 shares (38 per cent of shares), namely:
Wehner, Stewart Douglas (an individual) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020,
Amyes, Sarah Maree (a director) located at Rd 3,, Motueka postcode 7198. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 62 per cent of all shares (186 shares); it includes
Amyes, Sarah Maree (a director) - located at Rd 3,, Motueka. "Stationery retailing" (ANZSIC G427220) is the classification the ABS issued Not Just Books Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Feb 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Maree Amyes
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 28 Mar 2019
Rd 3,, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 15 Feb 2013 - current |
Mark Stephen Amyes
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 28 Feb 2019
Rd 3, Motueka, 7198
Address used since 15 Feb 2013 |
Director | 15 Feb 2013 - 10 Dec 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
44 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 | Physical & registered | 15 Feb 2013 - 17 Feb 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wehner, Stewart Douglas Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
24 Feb 2022 - current |
Amyes, Sarah Maree Director |
Rd 3, Motueka 7198 |
15 Feb 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Amyes, Sarah Maree Director |
Rd 3, Motueka 7198 |
15 Feb 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Amyes, Mark Stephen Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
15 Feb 2013 - 07 Jul 2023 |
Amyes, Mark Stephen Individual |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
15 Feb 2013 - 07 Jul 2023 |
The Lifestyle Foods Trust Other |
Rd 3 Motueka 7198 |
28 Mar 2019 - 24 Feb 2022 |
Caterade Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Moutere Motors Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Anjo Holdings Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Timberworks Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Native New Zealand Honey Limited 44 Oxford Street |
|
Glen Martin Electrical Limited 44 Oxford Street |
Thousand Mile Road Limited 36 Cable Bay Road |
J Life Limited 44 Futuna Close |
Finishing Touch Lasting Impressions Limited 49 Fortunatus Street |
Capital Office Supplies NZ Limited 116 Lambton Quay |
City Cards & Mags Limited 111 Customhouse Quay |
Tea Pea Limited 44 Simla Crescent |