Wf Trustees 2013 Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030374492) was launched on 24 Jan 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wf Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch. Our information was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Moorhouse Avenue, Addington, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered & service | 24 Jan 2013 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Hugh Clifford Matthews
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 01 Aug 2023
Strowan, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 24 Jan 2013 |
Director | 24 Jan 2013 - current |
Hugo James Mulligan
Rd 6, Christchurch, 7676
Address used since 01 Aug 2014 |
Director | 24 Jan 2013 - current |
James Ewan Leggat
Sumner, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 24 Jan 2013 |
Director | 24 Jan 2013 - current |
Glen James Ryan
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 01 Jan 2024
Rolleston, Rolleston, 7614
Address used since 18 Jan 2016 |
Director | 18 Jan 2016 - current |
Stuart Roy Stock
Days Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 14 Feb 2018 |
Director | 14 Feb 2018 - current |
Lauraine Beverley Frampton
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 06 Oct 2023 |
Director | 06 Oct 2023 - current |
Samuel Patrick Thorp
Bryndwr, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 01 Apr 2024 |
Director | 01 Apr 2024 - current |
Mark James Orman
St Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 14 Feb 2018 |
Director | 14 Feb 2018 - 27 May 2022 |
Kenneth James Jones
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 23 Dec 2015 |
Director | 24 Jan 2013 - 14 Feb 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wf Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036934621 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch |
21 Feb 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mulligan, Hugo James Director |
Rd 6 Christchurch 7676 |
24 Jan 2013 - 21 Feb 2019 |
Matthews, Hugh Clifford Director |
Strowan Christchurch 8052 |
24 Jan 2013 - 21 Feb 2019 |
Jones, Kenneth James Individual |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
24 Jan 2013 - 12 Apr 2018 |
White Fox & Jones Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031919258 Company Number: 129566 Entity |
12 Apr 2018 - 21 Feb 2019 | |
White Fox & Jones Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031919258 Company Number: 129566 Entity |
12 Apr 2018 - 21 Feb 2019 | |
Venlaw Estates Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031919258 Company Number: 129566 Entity |
22 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch |
12 Apr 2018 - 21 Feb 2019 |
Kenneth James Jones Director |
Merivale Christchurch 8014 |
24 Jan 2013 - 12 Apr 2018 |
Leggat, James Ewan Director |
Sumner Christchurch 8081 |
24 Jan 2013 - 21 Feb 2019 |
Consortium Group Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
|
Big Media International Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
|
Wf Trustees 2012 Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
|
Wf Trustees 2011 Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
|
Wf Trustees 2010 Limited Level 3 |
|
Venlaw Nominees Limited Level 3 |