Both Brains Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030386235) was launched on 14 Jan 2013. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Suite 3, 99 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 (type: registered, physical). Long Bay Farm, 2000 Beach Road, Torbay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 04 Sep 2019. Both Brains Limited used other aliases, namely: Mint It Solutions Limited from 12 May 2014 to 10 Dec 2019, The Mint Group Limited (28 Mar 2014 to 12 May 2014) and Bluefin Technology Limited (10 Jan 2013 - 28 Mar 2014). 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Howard, Ryan Hudson (a director) located at Lower Shotover, Queenstown postcode 9304,
Freeman Trustee Albany Limited (an entity) located at Albany Village, Auckland postcode 0632. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Howard, Ryan Hudson (a director) - located at Lower Shotover, Queenstown. "Computer consultancy service" (ANZSIC M700010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Both Brains Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
P O Box 89133, Torbay, Auckland, 0742 | Postal | 27 Aug 2019 |
Suite 3, 99 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Office & delivery | 27 Aug 2019 |
Suite 3, 99 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland, 0622 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ryan Hudson Howard
Lower Shotover, Queenstown, 9304
Address used since 04 Jun 2021
Takapuna, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 27 Aug 2019
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 08 Sep 2015
Long Bay, Auckland, 0742
Address used since 03 Aug 2018 |
Director | 14 Jan 2013 - current |
12a Clayton Street , Newmarket , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Long Bay Farm, 2000 Beach Road, Torbay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2017 - 04 Sep 2019 |
Office 4b, 39 Woodside Avenue, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & registered | 01 Jul 2015 - 20 Sep 2017 |
12a Clayton Street, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 20 Apr 2015 - 01 Jul 2015 |
Pier D, 185 Westhaven Drive, Westhaven, Auckland, 1011 | Registered & physical | 17 Sep 2014 - 20 Apr 2015 |
Building 2, Unit F, 100 Bush Road, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 04 Jun 2014 - 17 Sep 2014 |
34 Waterview Road, Stanley Point, Auckland, 0624 | Registered & physical | 07 Apr 2014 - 04 Jun 2014 |
Long Bay Farm, Torbay, Auckland, 0742 | Physical & registered | 14 Jan 2013 - 07 Apr 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Howard, Ryan Hudson Director |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 |
14 Jan 2013 - current |
Freeman Trustee Albany Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030429338 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Albany Village Auckland 0632 |
11 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Howard, Ryan Hudson Director |
Lower Shotover Queenstown 9304 |
14 Jan 2013 - current |
Andark Business Limited Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Road |
|
B T Walton Business Limited Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Road |
|
Management Accountants Mgb Limited Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Road |
|
Bush Road Accounting Limited Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Rd |
|
Ehealth Consulting Limited Unit E 2/100 Bush Road |
|
Sustainable Properties (anderson) Limited Unit A, Building 1, 100 Bush Road |
It Consultants NZ Limited 106a Bush Road |
Visiogeek Limited 106a Bush Road |
Aptapp Limited Level 1, 17c Corinthian Drive |
I.t. Sales And Service Limited 7 Emerald Way |
Meteoric Marketing Limited Albany Heights |
Distributed Systems Limited 4 Columbia Place |