Bill Mcgechie Trustees Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429030400306) was registered on 21 Dec 2012. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 33 Selwyn Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Dog Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Onehunga, Auckland postcode 1061. Businesscheck's database was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33 Selwyn Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered & service | 21 Dec 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Brendan Timothy Wood
Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Rd 2, Onewhero, 2697
Address used since 03 Aug 2018 |
Director | 17 Jan 2013 - current |
Tara Wratten
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 04 Aug 2015 - current |
David Kevin Gray
One Tree Hill, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 20 Nov 2019 |
Director | 20 Nov 2019 - current |
Bronwyn Ann Hantz
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 04 Mar 2021
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 29 Nov 2019 |
Director | 29 Nov 2019 - current |
Peter Andrew Oliver
Mount Albert, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 21 Dec 2012 - 14 Jun 2024 |
Timothy John Goulding
Rd 1, Amberley, 7481
Address used since 03 Aug 2018
Rd 7, Rangiora, 7477
Address used since 01 Sep 2016
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 29 Aug 2017 |
Director | 17 Jan 2013 - 04 Mar 2021 |
Guy Patrick Newlove
Clarks Beach, Clarks Beach, 2122
Address used since 01 Sep 2016 |
Director | 21 Dec 2012 - 24 Jun 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dog Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030755475 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
21 Dec 2012 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Dog Trustee Company Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 3748219 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Hoddle Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Spring And Autumn Trustees Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Carian Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
M & M Waters Trustee Company Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Dkl Trustees No1 Limited 33 Selwyn Street |
|
Philorth Trustees Limited 33 Selwyn Street |