Grant Cashmore Limited (issued a business number of 9429030451629) was started on 06 Nov 2012. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: Po Box 929, Hamilton, 3240 (type: postal, office). Grant Cashmore Limited used more names, namely: Warwick Cashmore Limited from 06 Nov 2012 to 15 Sep 2015. 12000 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 1200 shares (10% of shares), namely:
Warwick Cashmore (a director) located at Birkenhead, Auckland postcode 0626,
Cashmore, Warwick Norman (an individual) located at Penrose, Auckland postcode 1061. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10% of all shares (exactly 1200 shares); it includes
Cashmore, Bridget Ann (an individual) - located at Penrose, Auckland. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (9600 shares, 80%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Cashmore, Grant Michael, located at Penrose, Auckland (an individual). "Service to finance and investment nec" (business classification K641945) is the category the ABS issued to Grant Cashmore Limited. Our data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 10, Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Nov 2012 |
Po Box 929, Hamilton, 3240 | Postal | 28 Sep 2020 |
Level 10, Kpmg Centre, 85 Alexandra Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Office & delivery | 28 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Michael Cashmore
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Feb 2024
Bethells Beach, 0781
Address used since 01 Jan 2018
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 25 May 2015 |
Director | 25 May 2015 - current |
Geraldine Ellen Cashmore
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Feb 2024
Bethells Beach, 0781
Address used since 01 Jan 2018
East Tamaki, Auckland, 2013
Address used since 13 Oct 2016 |
Director | 13 Oct 2016 - current |
Warwick Norman Cashmore
Birkenhead, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 06 Nov 2012 |
Director | 06 Nov 2012 - 27 Sep 2016 |
Level 10, Kpmg Centre , 85 Alexandra Street , Hamilton , 3204 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Warwick Norman Cashmore Director |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
06 Nov 2012 - current |
Cashmore, Warwick Norman Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
06 Nov 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cashmore, Bridget Ann Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
22 Jul 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cashmore, Grant Michael Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
22 Jul 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cashmore, Brenda Joyce Individual |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
06 Nov 2012 - 20 Jul 2016 |
30 Seconds Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
|
Manor Homes Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
|
Absolute Pet Care Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
|
Miller Financial Services Limited 85 Alexandra Street |
|
Weight Loss Surgery Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
|
J & V Roskam Farms Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
Geopro Investments Limited Level 10, Kpmg Centre |
Pfs Holdings Limited 54a Casey Avenue |
Bellagio Finance Limited 16/111 Thomas Road |
Jas Fx Trader Limited 19 Norfolk Drive |
Money-bridge Limited 1128 Tahuroa Road |
Choice Financial Services Limited 437 Rickit Road |