Mk Trustee (Fellows) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030498044) was started on 26 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: physical, service). 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their physical address, up until 07 Aug 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Morrison Kent Limited (an entity) located at Wellington Central, Wellington postcode 6011. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Mk Trustee (Fellows) Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service & registered | 07 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray George Harden
Raumati South, Paraparaumu, 5032
Address used since 02 Aug 2022
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 26 Sep 2012
Whitby, Porirua, 5024
Address used since 01 Jun 2017 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - current |
Matthew Peter Whimp
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 01 May 2016 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - current |
Andrew James Stewart
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 26 Sep 2012 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - current |
Richard Hudson Caughley
Te Aro, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 12 Mar 2020
Wadestown, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 26 Sep 2012 |
Director | 26 Sep 2012 - 08 Nov 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
105 The Terrace, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 26 Sep 2012 - 07 Aug 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrison Kent Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035413851 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
30 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whimp, Matthew Peter Director |
Te Aro Wellington 6011 |
26 Sep 2012 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Stewart, Andrew James Director |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
26 Sep 2012 - 30 Jul 2019 |
Effective Date | 29 Jul 2019 |
Name | Morrison Kent Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1510047 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Floor 19, 105 The Terrace Wellington Central Wellington 6011 |
Karma Drinks Limited Level 19 |
|
Mk Trustee (ktg) Limited 105 The Terrace |
|
Rosco Ice Cream Limited 105 The Terrace |
|
Wayfairer Limited Level 19 |
|
Alco Trustee Limited Level 19 |
|
All Good Bananas Limited Level 19 |
Waterfall Bay Trustee No. 1 Limited 105 The Terrace |
Trison Management Services Limited Level 19 |
Mk Trustee (gibbons) Limited 105 The Terrace |
Tofino Trustee Limited 89 The Terrace |
Treadwells Trustee Services Limited Level 14 |
Treadwells Trustees 11 Limited Level 14 |