Sachi Investments Limited (NZBN 9429030514522) was incorporated on 24 Sep 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 407 Chapel Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016 (type: physical, service). 58A Commodore Drive, Lynfield, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 27 Nov 2019. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 20 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Rathod, Sachi (an individual) located at East Tamaki, Auckland postcode 2016. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40% of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Rathod, Kalpana (an individual) - located at East Tamaki, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (40 shares, 40%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rathod, Nitin Kumar, located at Lynfield, Auckland (a director). "Investment - non financial assets nec" (ANZSIC L664010) is the category the ABS issued to Sachi Investments Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
407 Chapel Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016 | Registered | 27 Nov 2019 |
407 Chapel Road, East Tamaki, Auckland, 2016 | Physical & service | 19 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nitin Kumar Rathod
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 24 Sep 2012 |
Director | 24 Sep 2012 - current |
Kalpana Rathod
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 24 Sep 2012 |
Director | 24 Sep 2012 - 31 Mar 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58a Commodore Drive, Lynfield, Auckland, 1042 | Registered | 24 Sep 2012 - 27 Nov 2019 |
58a Commodore Drive, Lynfield, Auckland, 1042 | Physical | 24 Sep 2012 - 19 Aug 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rathod, Sachi Individual |
East Tamaki Auckland 2016 |
11 Oct 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rathod, Kalpana Individual |
East Tamaki Auckland 2016 |
24 Sep 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rathod, Nitin Kumar Director |
Lynfield Auckland 1042 |
24 Sep 2012 - current |
Commodore Electrical Limited 50a Commodore Drive |
|
Amphibious Gym Limited 64 Commodore Drive |
|
D & P Ramanlal Trustee Limited 53a Commodore Drive |
|
Native Herbs Limited 22a Rangitiki Crescent |
|
Stars Glass Decorating Service Limited 49a Commodore Drive |
|
Trust Triton Limited 18 Rangitiki Crescent |
The Burndred Land Company Limited 8a Lifford Place |
Belbermeer Trustee Limited 8a Lifford Place |
Citic Urban Investment Limited 9a Preston Avenue |
Iron Age Investments Limited 3 Morvern Road |
Under The Neath Trust Trustee Company Limited 1 Scenic Drive |
I Ragazzi Trust Trustee Company Limited 1 Scenic Drive |