Insite Insurance Limited (NZBN 9429030573932) was launched on 31 Jul 2012. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Suite 2B, 7 Wrightson Way, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: office, delivery). 22 Wesley Street, Pukekohe had been their registered address, up until 12 Aug 2022. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Professional Trustee Services 2023 Limited (an entity) located at Papakura, Auckland postcode 2110,
Tamatea, Hayley Elizabeth (a director) located at Rd 1, Papakura postcode 2580,
Tamatea, Micheal Bodee (a director) located at Rd 1, Papakura postcode 2580. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Tamatea, Hayley Elizabeth (a director) - located at Rd 1, Papakura. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Tamatea, Micheal Bodee, located at Rd 1, Papakura (a director). "General insurance" (ANZSIC K632230) is the category the ABS issued Insite Insurance Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 West Street, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Office & delivery | 16 Aug 2019 |
Po Box 64, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2340 | Postal | 16 Aug 2019 |
Suite 2b, 7 Wrightson Way, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Aug 2022 |
Suite 2b, 7 Wrightson Way, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Office & delivery | 02 Aug 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Micheal Bodee Tamatea
Rd 1, Papakura, 2580
Address used since 11 May 2023 |
Director | 11 May 2023 - current |
Hayley Elizabeth Tamatea
Rd 1, Papakura, 2580
Address used since 11 May 2023 |
Director | 11 May 2023 - current |
Edward Francis Morrice
Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 02 Mar 2021
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 31 Jul 2012 |
Director | 31 Jul 2012 - 11 May 2023 |
Lynda Kay Morrice
Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 02 Mar 2021
Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120
Address used since 31 Jul 2012 |
Director | 31 Jul 2012 - 11 May 2023 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Suite 2b, 7 Wrightson Way, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Office & delivery | 02 Aug 2023 |
22 West Street , Pukekohe , Pukekohe , 2120 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
22 Wesley Street, Pukekohe, 2120 | Registered & physical | 10 Mar 2021 - 12 Aug 2022 |
22 West Street, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Physical & registered | 31 Jul 2012 - 10 Mar 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Professional Trustee Services 2023 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050941575 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Papakura Auckland 2110 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Tamatea, Hayley Elizabeth Director |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Tamatea, Micheal Bodee Director |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tamatea, Hayley Elizabeth Director |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tamatea, Micheal Bodee Director |
Rd 1 Papakura 2580 |
18 May 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morrice, Lynda Kay Individual |
Pukekohe 2120 |
31 Jul 2012 - 18 May 2023 |
Morrice, Edward Francis Individual |
Pukekohe 2120 |
31 Jul 2012 - 18 May 2023 |
Pukekohe Korean Presbyterian Church 30 West Street |
|
Awhi Mai Trust 4 West Street |
|
Emandjay Enterprises Limited 13 West Street |
|
Cpl Bayliss Trustee Limited 13 West Street |
|
Target Sports NZ Limited 13 West Street |
|
Retama Holdings Limited 13 West Street |
King Innovations Limited 1 Ridge View Crescent |
Warren Butler Insurance Limited 74 Dale Road |
Celestial Insurance Services Limited 33 Ramsey Street |
Key Financial Services Limited 88a Ranfurly Road |
Future Plan Financial Services Limited 16 Kohanga Road |
The Insurance Guy Limited 30 Fairwater Road |