Murchison Supermarket Limited (issued a business number of 9429030588585) was started on 25 Jul 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 41 Fairfax Street, Murchison, Murchison, 7007 (type: registered, physical). 175 Fairfax Street, Murchison had been their physical address, up until 12 Nov 2020. 1000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 498 shares (49.8 per cent of shares), namely:
Hocking Family Trust (an other) located at Murchison, Murchison postcode 7007. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Hocking, Richard Kim (an individual) - located at Murchison, Murchison. The third group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hocking, Janelle Allison, located at Murchison, Murchison (an individual). "Grocery supermarket operation" (ANZSIC G411040) is the category the ABS issued Murchison Supermarket Limited. Our information was updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
41 Fairfax Street, Murchison, Murchison, 7007 | Service & physical | 12 Nov 2020 |
41 Fairfax Street, Murchison, Murchison, 7007 | Registered | 10 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Hocking
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 08 Nov 2023
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 04 Nov 2020
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 18 Nov 2014 |
Director | 25 Jul 2012 - current |
Elizabeth Hocking
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 08 Nov 2023
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 18 Nov 2014 |
Director | 25 Jul 2012 - current |
Elizabeth Kaye Hocking
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 04 Nov 2020
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 18 Nov 2014 |
Director | 25 Jul 2012 - current |
Richard Kim Hocking
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 03 Nov 2023
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 03 Aug 2022 |
Director | 03 Aug 2022 - current |
Janelle Allison Hocking
Murchison, Murchison, 7007
Address used since 03 Aug 2022 |
Director | 03 Aug 2022 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
175 Fairfax Street, Murchison, 7007 | Physical | 26 Nov 2014 - 12 Nov 2020 |
52 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered | 26 Nov 2014 - 10 Nov 2022 |
140 Fairfax Street, Murchison, 7201 | Physical & registered | 05 Sep 2013 - 26 Nov 2014 |
140 Fairfax Street, Murchison, Murchison, 7007 | Physical | 25 Jul 2012 - 05 Sep 2013 |
52 Grove Road, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered | 25 Jul 2012 - 05 Sep 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hocking Family Trust Other (Other) |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
08 Nov 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hocking, Richard Kim Individual |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
22 Jun 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hocking, Janelle Allison Individual |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
22 Jun 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hocking, Richard Director |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
25 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hocking, Elizabeth Director |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
25 Jul 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sara, Julia Ruth Individual |
Murchison Murchison 7007 |
20 Dec 2022 - 08 Nov 2023 |
K & J Trustees No1 Limited 52 Grove Road |
|
Russ Tree Services Limited 52 Grove Road |
|
Phw Contracting Limited 52 Grove Road |
|
Djc Henriksen Contracting Limited 52 Grove Road |
|
D.j.w. Construction Limited 52 Grove Road |
|
Tranzline Training Services Limited 52 Grove Road |
Ew Freshfoods Limited 2 Alfred Street |
Hj & Hp Watson Limited Shop 1, 100 High Street |
Aladdin Group Limited Havelock Four Square Supermarket |
Nelson City Supermarket Limited 69 Collingwood Street |
Yan & Chiu Holding Co. Limited 28 Hopper Street |
Christini Retail Limited Floor 1, 50 Customhouse Quay |