B S & A O'neill Trustees Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030621701) was started on 10 Jul 2012. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 52 Bruce Road, Rd 1, Outram, 9073 (type: delivery, postal). 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 20 shares (20% of shares), namely:
Moran, Carmen Maria (an individual) located at Forbury, Dunedin postcode 9012. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20% of all shares (20 shares); it includes
Carline, Stephanie Kaye (an individual) - located at Cromwell. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (20 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
O'neill, Sandra Jane, located at Alexandra, Alexandra (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
52 Bruce Road, Rd 1, Outram, 9073 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Jul 2012 |
52 Bruce Road, Rd 1, Outram, 9073 | Delivery & postal & office | 16 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ann O'neill
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 17 Jul 2012 |
Director | 17 Jul 2012 - current |
Jo-anna Gabrielle Hoets
Casebrook, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 20 May 2021 |
Director | 20 May 2021 - current |
Bernard Stafford O'neill
Alexandra, Alexandra, 9320
Address used since 17 Jul 2012 |
Director | 17 Jul 2012 - 04 May 2021 |
Michael Martin O'neill
Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016
Address used since 10 Jul 2012 |
Director | 10 Jul 2012 - 22 Aug 2012 |
52 Bruce Road , Rd 1 , Outram , 9073 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moran, Carmen Maria Individual |
Forbury Dunedin 9012 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carline, Stephanie Kaye Individual |
Cromwell 9384 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Sandra Jane Individual |
Alexandra Alexandra 9320 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hoets, Jo-anna Gabrielle Individual |
Casebrook Christchurch 8051 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Richard Stafford Individual |
Rd 1 Outram 9073 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'neill, Michael Martin Individual |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
10 Jul 2012 - 23 Aug 2012 |
Michael Martin O'neill Director |
Dunedin Central Dunedin 9016 |
10 Jul 2012 - 23 Aug 2012 |
Steve Scoles Trading Limited Airport Turnoff |