Learn En Play Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429030641280) was started on 01 Jun 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 39C Abercrombie Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 (type: physical, service). 140 Mellons Bay Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 22 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Camus, Ma. Lourdes Tatom (a director) located at Howick, Auckland postcode 2014. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Camus, Carmelo Nino Quitzon (a director) - located at Howick, Auckland. "Child care service" (business classification Q871010) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Learn En Play Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
39c Abercrombie Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Registered | 10 Jun 2015 |
39c Abercrombie Street, Howick, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & service | 22 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ma. Lourdes Tatom Camus
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 12 Mar 2015 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - current |
Carmelo Nino Quitzon Camus
Howick, Auckland, 2014
Address used since 12 Mar 2015 |
Director | 01 Jun 2012 - current |
39c Abercrombie Street , Howick , Auckland , 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
140 Mellons Bay Road, Mellons Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Physical | 14 Jun 2013 - 22 Jun 2020 |
24a Mark Edward Drive, Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 | Registered | 01 Jun 2012 - 10 Jun 2015 |
24a Mark Edward Drive, Half Moon Bay, Auckland, 2012 | Physical | 01 Jun 2012 - 14 Jun 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Camus, Ma. Lourdes Tatom Director |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Camus, Carmelo Nino Quitzon Director |
Howick Auckland 2014 |
01 Jun 2012 - current |
Clearsight Consultants Limited 35 Mellons Bay Road |
|
Aspacific Corporation Limited 132 Mellons Bay Road |
|
Promet Investments Limited 132 Mellons Bay Road |
|
Zealion Investments Limited 132 Mellons Bay Road |
|
H And E Kwok Trustee Limited 104 Mellons Bay Road |
|
N.z Eisenerz Limited 156 Mellons Bay Road |
Happyhearts Limited 17 Cockle Bay Road |
Impressions Waikato Limited 140 Cook Street |
Pugmarks Limited 140 Cook Street |
Nestlings In-home Childcare Limited 8 Andrew Road |
Frog Puddles Childcare Centre Limited 14 Beltany Drive |
Magic Moments Learning Centre Limited 53 Trelawn Place |