Cityclean Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030729124) was started on 29 Mar 2012. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 20 James Road, Manurewa, Auckland, 2102 (type: registered, physical). 3 Dingwall Place, Papatoetoe, Auckland had been their registered address, until 10 Nov 2022. 200 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Pandya, Krishna Uday (an individual) located at Manurewa, Auckland postcode 2102. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 70 per cent of all shares (exactly 140 shares); it includes
Pandya, Uday (an individual) - located at Manurewa, Auckland. "Cleaning service" (ANZSIC N731110) is the category the ABS issued Cityclean Limited. Our data was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 James Road, Manurewa, Auckland, 2102 | Registered & physical & service | 10 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Uday Pandya
Manurewa, Auckland, 2102
Address used since 02 Nov 2022
Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025
Address used since 11 Jul 2019 |
Director | 11 Jul 2019 - current |
Saurabh Patel
Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 26 Sep 2016 |
Director | 29 Mar 2012 - 11 Jul 2019 |
Kinjal Patel
Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 26 Sep 2016 |
Director | 29 Mar 2012 - 11 Jul 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Dingwall Place, Papatoetoe, Auckland, 2025 | Registered & physical | 19 Jul 2019 - 10 Nov 2022 |
86b Seventh Avenue, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 04 Oct 2016 - 19 Jul 2019 |
531/a Blockhouse Bay Road, Blockhouse Bay, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & physical | 29 Mar 2012 - 04 Oct 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pandya, Krishna Uday Individual |
Manurewa Auckland 2102 |
25 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pandya, Uday Individual |
Manurewa Auckland 2102 |
11 Jul 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Patel, Saurabh Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
29 Mar 2012 - 11 Jul 2019 |
Patel, Kinjal Individual |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
29 Mar 2012 - 11 Jul 2019 |
Kinjal Limited 86b Seventh Avenue |
|
Carol Clayton And Associates Limited 95 Eighth Avenue |
|
Little Petal Limited 78 Seventh Avenue |
|
Blue Rovers Junior Football Club Incorporated 39 Edgecumbe Road |
|
Pohutukawa Finance Limited 88 Eighth Avenue |
|
Barnaby Smith Surgical Limited 90 Ninth Avenue |
A2 Clean Estate Limited 86 Ninth Avenue |
Helping Handz Services Limited 299 Cameron Road |
The Glass Professor Limited 181 Devonport Road |
Diamond Shine Cleaning Services Limited 26a Rimu Street |
Aaron Marine Limited 72b Levers Road |
Genesis Valet Limited 5 Doneraille Place |