Mad Entertainment Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429030780736) was registered on 24 Feb 2012. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 14A Arawata Terrace, Fernhill, Queenstown, 9300 (type: registered, service). 37B Elm Tree Avenue, Frankton, Queenstown had been their service address, up until 30 Oct 2023. 1 share is allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1 share (100% of shares), namely:
Jagjivan, Anant Natverlal (an individual) located at Fernhill, Queenstown postcode 9300. "Entertainer" (ANZSIC R900233) is the category the ABS issued to Mad Entertainment Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
37b Elm Tree Avenue, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Physical | 23 Aug 2021 |
37b Elm Tree Avenue, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Postal | 13 Dec 2021 |
14a Arawata Terrace, Fernhill, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & service | 30 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anant Natverlal Jagjivan
Fernhill, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 19 Oct 2023
Frankton, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 13 Aug 2021
Port Chalmers, Dunedin, 9023
Address used since 26 Oct 2016
Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310
Address used since 18 Oct 2017 |
Director | 24 Feb 2012 - current |
Shotover Street , Queenstown , Queenstown , 9300 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
37b Elm Tree Avenue, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Service & registered | 23 Aug 2021 - 30 Oct 2023 |
27b Avalon Crescent, Fernhill, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 13 May 2021 - 23 Aug 2021 |
4b Mansor Court, Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310 | Physical & registered | 27 Oct 2017 - 13 May 2021 |
7 Mary Street, Port Chalmers, Dunedin, 9010 | Physical & registered | 03 Nov 2016 - 27 Oct 2017 |
3/34 Tweed Street, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Registered & physical | 21 Dec 2015 - 03 Nov 2016 |
5/246 High Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 15 Dec 2014 - 21 Dec 2015 |
11 Carrick Glen Avenue, Flat Bush, Auckland, 2016 | Registered & physical | 26 Nov 2014 - 15 Dec 2014 |
7 Andros Place, Unsworth Heights, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2013 - 26 Nov 2014 |
2/17 Don Croot Street, Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 24 Feb 2012 - 30 Oct 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jagjivan, Anant Natverlal Individual |
Fernhill Queenstown 9300 |
24 Feb 2012 - current |
Lake Dunstan 'gold N Notes' Music Trust 13 Mansor Court |
|
Colourscape Limited 12 Mansor Court |
|
Moynihan Coastal Consulting Limited 27 Gair Avenue |
|
Edmonds Investments Limited 6 Gair Avenue |
|
Edmonds Motel Limited 6 Gair Avenue |
|
Acw Contracting Limited 23 Barry Avenue |
La Business Limited 21 Rannoch Drive |
Miss New Zealand Beauty Contest Limited Level 7 Forsyth Barr House |
Event Entertainment Limited Level 7, Forsyth Barr House |
House Of Bricks Limited 2 Bronte Way |
D J Wolfmans X Factor Entertainment Limited 7 Mckellar Place |
Danger Doll Limited 37 Highcrest Heights |