Gawith Trustees 2015 Limited (NZBN 9429030821552) was registered on 30 Jan 2012. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 4 Church Street, Masterton, 5810 (type: physical, service). Gawith Burridge Building, Cnr Queen Street & Lincoln Road, Masterton had been their registered address, up to 20 Feb 2015. 35 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 35 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Van Zyl, Deborah (a director) located at Rd 11, Masterton postcode 5871,
Williams, Michelle Jane (a director) located at Martinborough, Martinborough postcode 5711,
Parker, Adam Graeme (a director) located at Lansdowne, Masterton postcode 5810. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4 Church Street, Masterton, 5810 | Physical & service & registered | 20 Feb 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Adam Graeme Parker
Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 10 Apr 2016 |
Director | 30 Jan 2012 - current |
Deborah Van Zyl
Rd 11, Masterton, 5871
Address used since 01 Sep 2015 |
Director | 30 Jan 2012 - current |
Kylie Anne Moore
Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 01 Nov 2020 |
Director | 01 Nov 2020 - current |
Michelle Jane Williams
Martinborough, Martinborough, 5711
Address used since 01 Nov 2020 |
Director | 01 Nov 2020 - current |
Dean Terence O'leary
Masterton, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 01 Nov 2023 |
Director | 01 Nov 2023 - current |
Shannon Randolph Norling
Masterton, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 01 Nov 2017 |
Director | 01 Nov 2017 - 14 Feb 2020 |
Helen Rosemary Radersma
Rd 12, Masterton, 5872
Address used since 01 Nov 2019 |
Director | 01 Nov 2019 - 14 Feb 2020 |
Bruce Thomas Wagg
Lansdowne, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 30 Jan 2012 |
Director | 30 Jan 2012 - 31 Oct 2019 |
John William Kershaw
Rd 11, Masterton, 5871
Address used since 20 Aug 2014 |
Director | 30 Jan 2012 - 01 Nov 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Gawith Burridge Building, Cnr Queen Street & Lincoln Road, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & physical | 30 Jan 2012 - 20 Feb 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Van Zyl, Deborah Director |
Rd 11 Masterton 5871 |
30 Jan 2012 - current |
Williams, Michelle Jane Director |
Martinborough Martinborough 5711 |
28 Sep 2023 - current |
Parker, Adam Graeme Director |
Lansdowne Masterton 5810 |
30 Jan 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wagg, Bruce Thomas Individual |
Lansdowne Masterton 5810 |
30 Jan 2012 - 01 Nov 2019 |
Kershaw, John William Individual |
Rd 11 Masterton 5871 |
30 Jan 2012 - 26 Nov 2015 |
John William Kershaw Director |
Rd 11 Masterton 5871 |
30 Jan 2012 - 26 Nov 2015 |
Gawith Trustees 2020 Limited 4 Church Street |
|
Gawith Trustees 2019 Limited 4 Church Street |
|
Gawith Trustees 2017 Limited 4 Church Street |
|
Gawith Trustees 2016 Limited 4 Church Street |
|
Gawith Trustees 2018 Limited 4 Church Street |
|
Gawith Trustees 2014 Limited 4 Church Street |