Toptoys (Nz) Limited (NZBN 9429030950955) was registered on 16 Sep 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 28 Helvetia Drive, Browns Bay, North Shore, Saint Johns, Auckland, 0630 (type: service, registered). 48 Bell Road, Remuera, Auckland had been their service address, up to 30 Jun 2023. 1000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 10 shares (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Chen, Shuyun (an individual) located at Browns Bay, Auckland postcode 0630. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 97 per cent of all shares (970 shares); it includes
Yu, Jing (a director) - located at Browns Bay, Auckland. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (20 shares, 2%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Zhang, Tao, located at Saint Johns, Auckland (an individual). "Internet only retailing" (ANZSIC G431050) is the classification the ABS issued Toptoys (Nz) Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
82d Elizabeth Knox Place, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Physical | 16 Apr 2020 |
80 Elizabeth Knox Place, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Registered | 23 Jun 2023 |
28 Helvetia Drive, Browns Bay, North Shore, Saint Johns, Auckland, 0630 | Service | 30 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jing Yu
Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 16 Sep 2011 - current |
Unit 2, 34 Hillside Road , Wairau Valley , Auckland , 0627 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
48 Bell Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Service | 23 Jun 2023 - 30 Jun 2023 |
82d Elizabeth Knox Place, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & service | 16 Apr 2020 - 23 Jun 2023 |
34b Hillside Rd, Glenfield, Auckland, 0627 | Registered & physical | 31 Oct 2016 - 16 Apr 2020 |
34b Hillside Road, Wairau Valley, Auckland, 0627 | Physical | 12 Jun 2013 - 31 Oct 2016 |
28 Helvetia Drive, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Registered | 16 Sep 2011 - 31 Oct 2016 |
28 Helvetia Drive, Browns Bay, Auckland, 0630 | Physical | 16 Sep 2011 - 12 Jun 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Shuyun Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
16 Mar 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yu, Jing Director |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
16 Sep 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhang, Tao Individual |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 |
15 Mar 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chen, Shuyun Individual |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 |
28 Sep 2018 - 15 Mar 2021 |
Chen, Shuyun Individual |
Wairau Valley Auckland 0627 |
28 Sep 2018 - 15 Mar 2021 |
Chen, Shuyun Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
08 Jan 2012 - 20 Apr 2016 |
Chen, Shuyun Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
28 Sep 2018 - 15 Mar 2021 |
Zhang, Tao Individual |
Browns Bay Auckland 0630 |
16 Sep 2011 - 26 Mar 2019 |
North Harbour 4 X 4 Limited 34 Hillside Road |
|
North Shore 4x4 Limited 34 Hillside Road |
|
Prime Capital Limited 51 Hillside Road |
|
Oneplus Motors Limited Unit5/30 Hillside Road |
|
Asia Motors Limited 4-28 Hillside Road |
|
D&k Lighting Limited 36b Hillside Road |
Happy New Zealand Limited 1/91 Diana Drive |
Pukeko Garden Limited Unit 2, 77 Porana Road |
Loose Goose Limited Suite 8, 75 Ellice Road |
Rr Trading Limited 2/51 Ellice Road |
Androidlet International Trading Limited 11 Benders Avenue |
Influx Trading Limited 38 Velma Road |