Ferry Gp Investments Limited (NZBN 9429030969032) was registered on 26 Aug 2011. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Mersham Drive, Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 4 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 08 Sep 2020. 150 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 24 shares (16 per cent of shares), namely:
Price, Marion (an individual) located at Prebbleton, Prebbleton postcode 7604. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 16 per cent of all shares (24 shares); it includes
Price, Lesley Isabell (an individual) - located at Prebbleton, Prebbleton. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (51 shares, 34%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Price, John Edward, located at Prebbleton, Prebbleton (a director). "Building, house construction" (ANZSIC E301120) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Ferry Gp Investments Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Mersham Drive, Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Philip Price
Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604
Address used since 09 Aug 2018
Redwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 28 Aug 2014 |
Director | 26 Aug 2011 - current |
John Edward Price
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 11 Oct 2021
Redwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 11 Aug 2015
Prebbleton, Prebbleton, 7604
Address used since 09 Aug 2018 |
Director | 26 Aug 2011 - current |
Raymond Neil Wedlake
Redwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 11 Aug 2015 |
Director | 26 Aug 2011 - 06 May 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 4 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 29 Mar 2019 - 08 Sep 2020 |
4 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 26 Sep 2017 - 29 Mar 2019 |
Unit 1/88 Hayton Road, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2012 - 26 Sep 2017 |
1, 88 Hayton Road, Wigram, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered & physical | 19 Oct 2011 - 18 Sep 2012 |
116 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 26 Aug 2011 - 19 Oct 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Price, Marion Individual |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 |
09 Aug 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Price, Lesley Isabell Individual |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 |
09 Aug 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Price, John Edward Director |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 |
26 Aug 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Price, Grant Philip Director |
Prebbleton Prebbleton 7604 |
26 Aug 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wedlake, Raymond Neil Individual |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 |
26 Aug 2011 - 31 May 2016 |
Raymond Neil Wedlake Director |
Redwood Christchurch 8051 |
26 Aug 2011 - 31 May 2016 |
Tiro Medical Limited Ground Floor, 6 Hazeldean Road |
|
Overland Express Limited L3, 2 Hazeldean Road |
|
Hazeldean Helicopters Limited 12 Hazeldean Road |
|
Nuenz Limited 12 Hazeldean Road |
|
Monday Room Limited 12 Hazeldean Road |
|
Hazeldean Aviation Limited 12 Hazeldean Road |
Consortium Group Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
Consortium Construction Housing Auckland Limited 22 Moorhouse Avenue |
Build Master Homes Limited 335 Lincoln Road |
Ab Property Services Limited Level 1, 100 Moorhouse Avenue |
Brittmac Build Limited Level 1/4 Hazeldean Rd |
Morgan Project Services Pty Limited Level 1, 22 Foster Street |