R G Roberts Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429030975545) was launched on 01 Sep 2011. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, Oamaru, 9400 (type: physical, registered). 1 Coquet Street, Oamaru had been their registered address, up until 13 Aug 2019. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Veritas (2010) Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8013,
Roberts, Robert Glynn (a director) located at Rd 14O, Oamaru postcode 9495. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Roberts, Robert Glynn (a director) - located at Rd 14O, Oamaru. "Painting of buildings or other structures" (business classification E324420) is the classification the ABS issued R G Roberts Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 27 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, Oamaru, 9400 | Physical & service | 13 Aug 2019 |
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered | 13 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert Glynn Roberts
Rd 14o, Oamaru, 9495
Address used since 28 Aug 2020
Cromwell, Cromwell, 9310
Address used since 06 Aug 2018
Bishopdale, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 01 Sep 2011 |
Director | 01 Sep 2011 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered | 21 Aug 2014 - 13 Aug 2019 |
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, Oamaru, 9400 | Physical | 15 Aug 2014 - 13 Aug 2019 |
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Registered | 08 Oct 2012 - 21 Aug 2014 |
1 Coquet Street, Oamaru, 9400 | Physical | 08 Oct 2012 - 15 Aug 2014 |
3/12 Main North Road, Papanui, Christchurch, 8542 | Registered & physical | 01 Sep 2011 - 08 Oct 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Veritas (2010) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031695121 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
01 Sep 2011 - current |
Roberts, Robert Glynn Director |
Rd 14o Oamaru 9495 |
01 Sep 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Roberts, Robert Glynn Director |
Rd 14o Oamaru 9495 |
01 Sep 2011 - current |
Taupo Farming Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Seamist Dairies Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Tamac Farms Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Hireplus Oamaru Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Plunket Electrical (2005) Limited 1 Coquet Street |
|
Ad & De Purvis Limited 1 Coquet Street |
John Fenton Limited 2nd Floor |
Clark Decorating Sc Limited 1 Cains Terrace |
Vianen Builders Limited 26 Canon Street |
Diamond Painting Services Limited 10 Balmacewen Road |
Barry Egerton Painting Limited 374 South Road |
Otago Aerial And Satellite Limited 17 Peter Street |