Gartner 4Th Generation Limited (issued a business number of 9429030987548) was registered on 02 Sep 2011. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 8A Minto Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: registered, physical). 10 Castleton Street, Birkdale, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 20 Sep 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 13 shares (13 per cent of shares), namely:
Heimgartner, Andre Emil (an individual) located at Bundall, Queensland postcode 4217. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 11 per cent of all shares (11 shares); it includes
Heimgartner, Sheryl Dawn (an individual) - located at Onehunga, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (76 shares, 76%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Heimgartner, Renee Peta, located at Remuera, Auckland (an individual). "Trustee Company" (business classification K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Gartner 4Th Generation Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
134 Tuihana Drive, Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118 | Other (Address for Records) | 30 Apr 2020 |
76 Union Drive, Papamoa, Papamoa, 3118 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 11 Sep 2021 |
8a Minto Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Renee Peta Heimgartner
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Aug 2021
Birkdale, Auckland, 0626
Address used since 15 May 2020
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 31 Dec 2016
Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 01 Jan 2019 |
Director | 31 Dec 2016 - current |
Rebecca Jane Berry
Papamoa, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 11 Sep 2021 |
Director | 23 May 2017 - current |
Rebecca Jane Batt
Papamoa, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 11 Sep 2021
Schnapper Rock, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 23 May 2017
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 01 Oct 2017 |
Director | 23 May 2017 - current |
Sheryl Dawn Heimgartner
East Tamaki Heights, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 02 Sep 2011 |
Director | 02 Sep 2011 - 23 May 2017 |
Mark Heimgartner
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 01 Jan 2016 |
Director | 02 Sep 2011 - 31 Dec 2016 |
10 Castleton Street , Birkdale , Auckland , 0626 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 Castleton Street, Birkdale, Auckland, 0626 | Registered | 15 May 2020 - 20 Sep 2021 |
10 Castleton Street, Birkdale, Auckland, 0626 | Physical | 08 May 2020 - 20 Sep 2021 |
762 Chapel Road, Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 | Physical | 14 Mar 2019 - 08 May 2020 |
762 Chapel Road, Shamrock Park, Auckland, 2016 | Registered | 14 Mar 2019 - 15 May 2020 |
Unit 303, 367 Great North Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 14 Feb 2017 - 14 Mar 2019 |
8a Minto Road, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical & registered | 11 Mar 2016 - 14 Feb 2017 |
Unit 2, 35 Kingsview Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Physical & registered | 02 Sep 2011 - 11 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heimgartner, Andre Emil Individual |
Bundall Queensland 4217 |
05 Mar 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heimgartner, Sheryl Dawn Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1023 |
02 Sep 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heimgartner, Renee Peta Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Sep 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heimgartner, Mark Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Sep 2011 - 05 Mar 2018 |
Mark Heimgartner Director |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
02 Sep 2011 - 05 Mar 2018 |
The Harmoni Health Company Limited 204/367 Great North Road |
|
Polar Consulting Limited 101/367 Great North Rd |
|
Warren John Limited Apt304, 367 Great North Rd |
|
Stream Interactive Limited 381 Gt North Rd |
|
Pet.kiwi Limited 381 Great North Road |
|
Arahura Charitable Trust 393 Great North Road |
Kapers Trustee Company Limited 7 Elgin Street |
Brooklyn Collective Trustee Limited 14 Harcourt Street |
Roberta Trustee Limited 431 Great North Road |
Mct Nominees Limited 16 Ariki Street |
Lto Trustees Limited 571c Great North Road |
Channelle Trustees Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |