Aca Investments Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429030998445) was incorporated on 10 Aug 2011. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 77 Travis Country Drive, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 (type: registered, service). 60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 05 Apr 2018. Aca Investments Limited used other names, namely: Hughes & Bell Limited from 02 Aug 2011 to 19 Jun 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Robertson, Andrew (an individual) located at Burwood, Christchurch postcode 8083. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Robertson, Stephanie (an individual) - located at Burwood, Christchurch. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Aca Investments Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Physical & registered | 05 Apr 2018 |
77 Travis Country Drive, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 | Registered & service | 09 Jan 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stephanie Tracey Robertson
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 01 Dec 2021 |
Director | 01 Dec 2021 - current |
Tania Hui Hughes
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 01 Mar 2018
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 10 Aug 2011 |
Director | 10 Aug 2011 - 01 Dec 2021 |
Ronald Grant Hughes
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 10 Aug 2011
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 01 Mar 2018 |
Director | 10 Aug 2011 - 01 Dec 2021 |
Phillip Mark Bell
Parklands, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 31 Mar 2014 |
Director | 10 Aug 2011 - 30 Mar 2015 |
Clare Louise Bell
Parklands, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 31 Mar 2014 |
Director | 10 Aug 2011 - 30 Mar 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
60 Cashel Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 14 Nov 2016 - 05 Apr 2018 |
5 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical | 13 Mar 2012 - 14 Nov 2016 |
5 Sir Gil Simpson Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered | 10 Aug 2011 - 14 Nov 2016 |
77 Travis Country Drive, Burwood, Christchurch, 8083 | Physical | 10 Aug 2011 - 13 Mar 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Andrew Individual |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
14 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson, Stephanie Individual |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
14 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hughes, Tania Hui Individual |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 02 Dec 2021 |
St Martins Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037012472 Company Number: 1114935 Entity |
St Martins Christchurch |
10 Aug 2011 - 02 Dec 2021 |
St Martins Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037012472 Company Number: 1114935 Entity |
St Martins Christchurch |
10 Aug 2011 - 02 Dec 2021 |
St Martins Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037012472 Company Number: 1114935 Entity |
Saint Martins Christchurch 8022 |
10 Aug 2011 - 02 Dec 2021 |
Hughes, Ronald Grant Individual |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 02 Dec 2021 |
Bell, Clare Louise Individual |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 23 Mar 2015 |
Bell, Phillip Mark Individual |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 23 Mar 2015 |
Phillip Mark Bell Director |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 23 Mar 2015 |
Clare Louise Bell Director |
Parklands Christchurch 8083 |
10 Aug 2011 - 23 Mar 2015 |
Direct Paper Limited Level 4, 123 Victoria Street |
|
Ambrosia Nurseries Limited Level 4, 123 Victoria Street |
|
Eagle Direct Limited Level 4, 60 Cashel Street |
|
Zs Investments 2013 Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |
|
Weeping Angels Limited Level 2, 329 Durham Street |
|
Interpret Geospatial Solutions Limited Level 1, 137 Victoria Street |
Weeping Angels Limited Level 2, 329 Durham Street |
Streetco Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |
Howard Livingston Holdings Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |
Residential Un-limited Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |
Dj-inv Limited Level 2, 329 Durham Street |
Rwh (2014) Investments Limited Level 3, 50 Victoria Street |