Mansons Properties (Newmarket) Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031081665) was started on 30 May 2011. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: physical, registered). 72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, until 25 Jun 2020. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Mansons Development Limited (an entity) located at Parnell, Auckland postcode 1151. Our database was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 37697, Parnell, Auckland, 1151 | Postal | 17 Jun 2020 |
74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Office & delivery | 17 Jun 2020 |
74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical & registered & service | 25 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Edward Colin Manson
Saint Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 30 May 2011 |
Director | 30 May 2011 - current |
Culum Alexander Manson
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 08 Feb 2024
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Feb 2022
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 29 Nov 2013
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 14 Nov 2018
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 21 Jun 2019 |
Director | 29 Nov 2013 - current |
74 St Georges Bay Road , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 19 Jun 2014 - 25 Jun 2020 |
Suite 1, 72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered | 30 May 2011 - 19 Jun 2014 |
Suite 1, 72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 30 May 2011 - 25 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mansons Development Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042266525 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Parnell Auckland 1151 |
08 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Manson, Luke Edward Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
30 May 2011 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Manson, Edward Colin Director |
Saint Heliers Auckland 1071 |
30 May 2011 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Manson, Mac John Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
30 May 2011 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Mansons Finance Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030416031 Company Number: 4151378 Entity |
28 Oct 2016 - 28 Oct 2016 | |
Mansons Properties (newmarket) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031081665 Company Number: 3399791 Entity |
28 Oct 2016 - 08 May 2017 | |
Mansons Finance Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030416031 Company Number: 4151378 Entity |
28 Oct 2016 - 28 Oct 2016 | |
Mansons Properties (newmarket) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031081665 Company Number: 3399791 Entity |
28 Oct 2016 - 08 May 2017 | |
Manson, Culum Alexander Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
30 May 2011 - 28 Oct 2016 |
Ted Manson Community Trust 72 St Georges Bay Road |
|
Ted Manson Charitable Trust 72 St Georges Bay Road |
|
The Kelliher Charitable Trust Level 1 |
|
Garden To Table Limited 31-33 Ruskin Street |
|
Alter Industries Limited 2/62 St Georges Bay Rd |
|
Gordonhouse Lane Developments Limited 16 Ruskin Street |