Cookie Time International Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429031119313) was launched on 02 May 2011. 2 addresses are in use by the company: L3, 134 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch, 8011 (type: physical, registered). L3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch had been their physical address, up to 06 Aug 2018. Cookie Time International Limited used more names, namely: One Square Meal Limited from 26 Apr 2011 to 27 Jun 2013. 12000 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 6000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Mayell Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Burnside, Christchurch postcode 8053. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (6000 shares); it includes
Fairclough, John Scott (an individual) - located at Fendalton, Christchurch,
Keenan, Timothy James (an individual) - located at Ilam, Christchurch. "Corporate Head Office Management Services" (business classification M696110) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Cookie Time International Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
L3, 134 Oxford Terrace, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michael Edward John Mayell
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 08 Oct 2019
St Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 19 Sep 2017
Rd 2, Christchurch, 7672
Address used since 02 May 2011 |
Director | 02 May 2011 - current |
Guy William Clayton Pope-mayell
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 30 Apr 2013 |
Director | 02 May 2011 - current |
Mark William Russell
Rd 2, Rangiora, 7472
Address used since 08 Oct 2019
Rd 2, Rangiora, 7472
Address used since 28 May 2019 |
Director | 28 May 2019 - current |
Steven James Wakefield
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 01 Nov 2020 |
Director | 01 Nov 2020 - current |
Timothy James Keenan
Ilam, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 29 May 2024 |
Director | 29 May 2024 - current |
Lincoln James Lindsay Booth
Huntsbury, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 02 May 2011 |
Director | 02 May 2011 - 01 Jul 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
L3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 16 Oct 2015 - 06 Aug 2018 |
Level 3, 2 Hazeldean Road, Addington, Christchurch, 8140 | Physical & registered | 12 Nov 2013 - 16 Oct 2015 |
38 Orchard Road, Christchurch Airport, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered | 02 May 2011 - 12 Nov 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mayell Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047519046 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Burnside Christchurch 8053 |
03 Nov 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fairclough, John Scott Individual |
Fendalton Christchurch 8014 |
11 Dec 2017 - current |
Keenan, Timothy James Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8053 |
02 May 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pope-mayell, Guy William Clayton Director |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 |
02 May 2011 - 03 Nov 2021 |
Mayell, Michael Edward John Director |
St Albans Christchurch 8014 |
02 May 2011 - 11 Dec 2017 |
French Bakery Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Bunny Finance Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Close Quarters Holdings Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Taoco NZ Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
Safe Site Essentials Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
|
James Milne Holdings Limited L3, 134 Oxford Terrace |
Bc Management Services Limited 6e Pope Street |
Corporate Trust 2014 Limited 70 Arnold Street |
Otari Group Limited 246 Jacksons Road |
Guildford Investments Limited 54 Cass Street |
Lkm Creative Limited 2261 Lake Brunner Road |
Hilton Haulage Gp Limited 50 Sheffield Street |