Edgar Capital Qrc Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031132077) was incorporated on 15 Apr 2011. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 6, Forsyth Barr House, 35 The Octagon, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, service). Level 3, 258 Stuart Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, up to 20 Jun 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Edgar Capital Limited Partnership (an other) located at Level 7 265 Princes Street, Dunedin postcode 9016. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Edgar Capital Qrc Limited. Our data was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 7 John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & service & registered | 20 Jun 2018 |
Level 6, Forsyth Barr House, 35 The Octagon, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & service | 26 Apr 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alan James Mckenzie
Andersons Bay, Dunedin, 9013
Address used since 11 Mar 2016 |
Director | 15 Apr 2011 - current |
Hamish Eion Sinclair Edgar
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 18 Dec 2020 |
Director | 18 Dec 2020 - current |
Eion Sinclair Edgar
Kelvin Heights, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 15 Apr 2011 |
Director | 15 Apr 2011 - 14 Jun 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 258 Stuart Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 02 Apr 2012 - 20 Jun 2018 |
Level 3, 258 Stuart Street, Dunedin 9058, 0000 | Physical & registered | 15 Apr 2011 - 02 Apr 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Edgar Capital Limited Partnership Other (Other) |
Level 7 265 Princes Street Dunedin 9016 |
15 Apr 2011 - current |
Effective Date | 31 Mar 2018 |
Name | Sinclair Investments (2009) Lp |
Type | Ltd_partner_incorp |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2349668 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 7 John Wickliffe House 265 Princes Street Dunedin 9016 |
New Zealand Fruit Growers Limited Level 3 |
|
Rfh Trustees Limited 258 Stuart Street |
|
Greg Peoples Builders Limited 258 Stuart Street |
|
Zeagold Limited 258 Stuart Street |
|
Leisure Time Eco Homes Limited Level 3 |
|
Hhh Services Limited 258 Stuart Street |
Ph Shelf 24 Limited 139 Moray Place |
Ph Shelf 25 Limited 139 Moray Place |
Lovell Property Investments Limited 139 Moray Place |
Paimax Holdings Limited Floor 1 Burns House, 10 George Street |
Wr Trustees 02 Limited 1 Burns House, 10 George Street |
Wr Trustees 05 Limited 1 Burns House, 10 George Street |