Eskvale Developments Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429031139830) was incorporated on 11 Apr 2011. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 7, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical). Level 4, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin had been their physical address, until 12 Jun 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Webb Farry Trustees Limited (an entity) located at 70 Stuart Street, Dunedin postcode 9016,
Gavegan, Lex Arthur (a director) located at Rd 1, Taieri Mouth postcode 9091,
Gavegan, Susan Joy (a director) located at Saint Kilda, Dunedin postcode 9012. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Eskvale Developments Limited. The Businesscheck data was updated on 20 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 7, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 12 Jun 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Susan Joy Gavegan
Rd 1, Taieri Mouth, 9091
Address used since 30 Nov 2020
Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 11 Apr 2011 |
Director | 11 Apr 2011 - current |
Lex Arthur Gavegan
Rd 1, Taieri Mouth, 9091
Address used since 30 Nov 2020
Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 11 Apr 2011 |
Director | 11 Apr 2011 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, John Wickliffe House, 265 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 06 Dec 2012 - 12 Jun 2015 |
41a Tedder Street, Saint Kilda, Dunedin, 9012 | Physical & registered | 11 Apr 2011 - 06 Dec 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Webb Farry Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034791424 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
70 Stuart Street Dunedin 9016 |
11 Apr 2011 - current |
Gavegan, Lex Arthur Director |
Rd 1 Taieri Mouth 9091 |
11 Apr 2011 - current |
Gavegan, Susan Joy Director |
Saint Kilda Dunedin 9012 |
11 Apr 2011 - current |
Vision Chartered Accountants Trustees Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Emtech Limited Level 7, John Wickliffe House |
|
Rocklands Rural Water Scheme Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Downies Trustee (no. 2) Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Wrights Honey And Pollination Limited 265 Princes Street |
|
Nelson Plasterboard Services Limited Level 7 John Wickliffe House |
Real Estate Limited 265 Princes Street |
Black Tulip Investments Limited 118 High Street |
Get Up & Go Property Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
Ocms Joint Venture Properties Limited 7 Bond Street |
Gj And Jm Mcskimming Limited 6th Floor Consultancy House |
Glenorchy View Limited 6th Floor, Consultancy House |