Matida Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429031164757) was started on 29 Mar 2011. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 144 Markham Road, Rd 3, Pukekohe, 2579 (type: registered, physical). 64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe had been their registered address, up until 27 Nov 2018. Matida Investments Limited used more aliases, namely: T J and A 3 Limited from 25 Mar 2011 to 10 Dec 2014. 120 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 40 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Simons, Daphne Jasmine (an individual) located at Rd 1, Pukekohe postcode 2676. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Simons, Timothy John (an individual) - located at Tairua, Tairua. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (40 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Simons, Joyce Marieke, located at Rd 1, Pukekohe (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
144 Markham Road, Rd 3, Pukekohe, 2579 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Nov 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy John Simons
Tairua, Tairua, 3508
Address used since 29 Oct 2017
Rd 1, Pukekohe, 2676
Address used since 10 Dec 2014 |
Director | 10 Dec 2014 - current |
Joyce Marieke Simons
Rd 1, Pukekohe, 2676
Address used since 10 Dec 2014 |
Director | 10 Dec 2014 - current |
Daphne Jasmine Simons
Rd 1, Pukekohe, 2676
Address used since 10 Dec 2014 |
Director | 10 Dec 2014 - current |
Thecla Ellen Johnstone
Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677
Address used since 29 Mar 2011 |
Director | 29 Mar 2011 - 10 Dec 2014 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
64 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pukekohe, 2677 | Registered & physical | 29 Mar 2011 - 27 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Simons, Daphne Jasmine Individual |
Rd 1 Pukekohe 2676 |
10 Dec 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Simons, Timothy John Individual |
Tairua Tairua 3508 |
10 Dec 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Simons, Joyce Marieke Individual |
Rd 1 Pukekohe 2676 |
10 Dec 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Johnstone, Thecla Ellen Individual |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
29 Mar 2011 - 10 Dec 2014 |
Thecla Ellen Johnstone Director |
Rd 2 Pukekohe 2677 |
29 Mar 2011 - 10 Dec 2014 |
Alto Capital Investments 3 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Franklin Party Hire 2013 Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Investments Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
D M Roose Corporate Trustee Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Changing Jobs Limited 64 Beaver Road |
|
Sema Limited 64 Beaver Road |