Cunningham Kearney Consultants Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031166775) was incorporated on 20 Apr 2011. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 40 Mount Eden Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 (type: registered, service). Level 1, 40 Mt Eden Rd, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 21 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Lumine Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Mount Eden, Auckland, Null postcode 1024. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49 per cent of all shares (49 shares); it includes
Lumine Trustees Limited (an entity) - located at Mount Eden, Auckland, Null. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Kearney, Shaun, located at Mount Roskill, Auckland (an individual). "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the classification the ABS issued Cunningham Kearney Consultants Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
79 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Sep 2020 |
40 Mount Eden Road, Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024 | Registered & service | 22 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shaun Kearney
Mount Roskill, Auckland, 1041
Address used since 13 May 2023
Greenlane, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 22 Jun 2016 |
Director | 20 Apr 2011 - current |
Tim Cunningham
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 20 Apr 2011 |
Director | 20 Apr 2011 - 14 Jul 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 40 Mt Eden Rd, Auckland, 1024 | Physical | 23 May 2013 - 21 Sep 2020 |
Level 3, Suite 2, 160 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland, 1642 | Registered | 23 May 2013 - 21 Sep 2020 |
Level 3, Suite 2, 160 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland, 1642 | Registered | 10 Apr 2012 - 23 May 2013 |
Level 3, 160 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland, 1642 | Registered | 20 Apr 2011 - 10 Apr 2012 |
Level 3, 160 Grafton Road, Grafton, Auckland, 1642 | Physical | 20 Apr 2011 - 23 May 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lumine Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031297974 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Eden Auckland Null 1024 |
12 Mar 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lumine Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031297974 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Mount Eden Auckland Null 1024 |
12 Mar 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kearney, Shaun Individual |
Mount Roskill Auckland 1041 |
12 Mar 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Varoy, John Individual |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
14 Sep 2020 - 13 Feb 2024 |
Cunningham, Tim Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland 1021 |
20 Apr 2011 - 14 Sep 2020 |
Kearney, Shaun Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
20 Apr 2011 - 12 Mar 2012 |
Auckland Reinforcing Services (1995) Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds Street |
|
Llednarddot Farms Limited Level 7, 57 Symonds St |
|
The Well Body Clinic Limited Level 4, 3 Ferncroft St |
|
V&i Trustee Service Limited 97a Grafton Road |
|
Cao Trustee Services Limited 97a Grafton Road |
|
V & E Trustee Services Limited 97a Grafton Road |
The Value Exchange Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Mccomish Business Services Limited Level 2, 60 Grafton Road |
Redward Associates Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |
Donald Purdon & Associates Limited Level 2, 3 Arawa Street |
Motu Management Limited Level 6, 57 Symonds Street |
Barclay Consulting Limited Level 5, 64 Khyber Pass Road |