Elephant Hill Holdings Limited (issued a business number of 9429031334341) was incorporated on 21 Oct 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 4 Graham Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings had been their registered address, until 09 Dec 2021. 12000100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 12000100 shares (100 per cent of shares). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4 Graham Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Dec 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andreas Johann Werner Weiss
Rd 2, Havelock North, 4172
Address used since 20 Feb 2023
Haumoana, Hastings, 4180
Address used since 16 Sep 2015 |
Director | 16 Sep 2015 - current |
Emine W. | Director | 08 Feb 2017 - current |
Ralf-roger W. | Director | 21 Oct 2010 - 21 Sep 2016 |
Gunter Thies
Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 21 Oct 2010 |
Director | 21 Oct 2010 - 16 Sep 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 24 Oct 2019 - 09 Dec 2021 |
Business H Q, 308 Queen Street East, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 07 Jun 2016 - 24 Oct 2019 |
405n King Street, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 14 Nov 2011 - 07 Jun 2016 |
C/- Chapman Tripp, 10 Customhouse Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 21 Oct 2010 - 14 Nov 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weiss-camli, Emine Reydan Individual |
20 Jan 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elephant Hill Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031334396 Company Number: 3177291 Entity |
308 Queen Street East Hastings 4122 |
21 Oct 2010 - 20 Jan 2021 |
Elephant Hill Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031334396 Company Number: 3177291 Entity |
308 Queen Street East Hastings 4122 |
21 Oct 2010 - 20 Jan 2021 |
Antara Group Limited Business Hq |
|
Centric Group Limited Business Hq |
|
Hbs Capital Limited Unit 3, Business Hq |
|
Doll House Properties Limited Business H Q |
|
The Clifton Reserve Society Incorporated Moore Stephens Markhams Hawkes Bay Ltd |
|
Anacott Farms Limited Partnership Moore Stephens Markhams |