People 2.0 New Zealand Limited (NZBN 9429031531931) was registered on 20 May 2010. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 3, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington had been their registered address, until 21 Feb 2018. People 2.0 New Zealand Limited used more aliases, namely: Entity Solutions (Nz) Limited from 20 May 2010 to 22 Oct 2021. 1176 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1176 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
People 2.0 Australia (Est) Pty Ltd (an other) located at Melbourne, Victoria postcode 3000. "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued People 2.0 New Zealand Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 22 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 3, 44 Victoria Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Feb 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Steven Kenneth Schaus
Aurora, Ontario, L4G6K3
Address used since 17 Jun 2021 |
Director | 17 Jun 2021 - current |
Jason Feng
Mont Albert North, Melbourne, 3129
Address used since 15 Dec 2022 |
Director | 15 Dec 2022 - current |
Joanne Robyn Nixon
Fitzroy, Victoria, 3065
Address used since 01 Jul 2023 |
Director | 01 Jul 2023 - current |
Jason Todd King | Director | 17 Jun 2021 - 10 Mar 2023 |
Neil Mario Merola
Bullengarook, Victoria, 3437
Address used since 27 Jul 2017 |
Director | 27 Jul 2017 - 15 Dec 2022 |
Jonathan Knowles
Melbourne, Vic, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Glenhuntly, Victoria 3163,
Address used since 20 May 2010
Melbourne, Vic, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 20 May 2010 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Matthew Robert Franceschini
St Kilda, Victoria, 3182
Address used since 15 Feb 2018 |
Director | 15 Feb 2018 - 17 Jun 2021 |
Todrick Simon A'court Taylor
Seatoun, Wellington, 6022
Address used since 15 Feb 2018 |
Director | 15 Feb 2018 - 05 Aug 2019 |
Richard Bruce Hudson
Boulcott, Lower Hutt, 5010
Address used since 15 Feb 2018 |
Director | 15 Feb 2018 - 10 Sep 2018 |
Pedro Fric
Ascot Vale, Victoria 3032,
Address used since 20 May 2010
Melbourne, Vic, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Melbourne, Vic, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 20 May 2010 - 20 Mar 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 07 Mar 2016 - 21 Feb 2018 |
Level 6, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical | 11 Jun 2014 - 07 Mar 2016 |
C/-whk, Level 6 Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt | Registered & physical | 20 May 2010 - 11 Jun 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
People 2.0 Australia (est) Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
Melbourne Victoria 3000 |
20 May 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hudson Taylor Chartered Accountants Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031177993 Company Number: 3321291 Entity |
28 Mar 2018 - 06 Sep 2019 | |
Hudson Taylor Chartered Accountants Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429031177993 Company Number: 3321291 Entity |
44 Victoria Street Wellington 6011 |
28 Mar 2018 - 06 Sep 2019 |
J Building & Contracting Limited Level 3 |
|
Access-it Software International Limited 44 Victoria Street |
|
Upper Hutt Investments Limited Level 3 |
|
Hudson Taylor Chartered Accountants Limited Level 3 |
|
Gould Services Limited Level 3 |
|
Karena Consulting Limited Level 3 |
Gvg Limited Level 2, 24 Johnston Street |
Mml Group Limited Level 3, 44 Victoria Street |
Portman Holdings Limited Level 3, 44 Victoria Street |
Linda Sissons & Associates Limited Level 3, 44 Victoria Street |
Murray King & Francis Small Consultancy Limited 5th Floor |
Oneshot Rule Limited Floor 2, 111 Customhouse Quay |