Kawarau Village Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429031562003) was started on 29 Apr 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: physical, registered). Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 12 Oct 2017. Kawarau Village Limited used other aliases, namely: Entity Q Limited from 29 Apr 2010 to 24 Jan 2011. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Melview (Kawarau Falls Station) Investments Limited (In Rec) (an entity) located at 4 Graham Street, Auckland postcode 1010. "Hotel operation" (ANZSIC H440040) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Kawarau Village Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 01 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 12 Oct 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew John Mckay
Dannemora, Auckland, 2016
Address used since 16 Aug 2021 |
Director | 16 Aug 2021 - current |
Rees Graham Logan
Sandringham, Auckland, 1025
Address used since 10 Aug 2022 |
Director | 10 Aug 2022 - current |
Andrew James Bethell
Meadowbank, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 14 Mar 2012 |
Director | 14 Mar 2012 - 10 Aug 2022 |
James Henry Greenway
Hauraki, Auckland, 0622
Address used since 14 Mar 2012 |
Director | 14 Mar 2012 - 16 Aug 2021 |
Brian Mayo-smith
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Jan 2015 |
Director | 14 Mar 2012 - 20 May 2019 |
Garry Rex Looker
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Jun 2011 |
Director | 23 Sep 2010 - 14 Mar 2012 |
Brendon James Gibson
Epsom, Auckland,
Address used since 29 Apr 2010 |
Director | 29 Apr 2010 - 23 Sep 2010 |
Grant Robert Graham
Kohimarama, Auckland,
Address used since 29 Apr 2010 |
Director | 29 Apr 2010 - 23 Sep 2010 |
Level 4, Bdo Centre , 4 Graham Street , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 8, 120 Albert Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 17 May 2012 - 12 Oct 2017 |
C/-minter Ellison Rudd Watts, Level 20, Lumley Centre, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 14 Nov 2011 - 17 May 2012 |
C/-minter Ellison Rudd Watts, Level 20, Lumley Centre, 88 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 17 Feb 2011 - 17 May 2012 |
C/-kordamentha, Level 16, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered | 29 Apr 2010 - 17 Feb 2011 |
C/-kordamentha, Level 16, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Physical | 29 Apr 2010 - 14 Nov 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Melview (kawarau Falls Station) Investments Limited (in Rec) Shareholder NZBN: 9429033254371 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
4 Graham Street Auckland 1010 |
29 Apr 2010 - current |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Melview (kawarau Falls Station) Investments Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1964728 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Rs Trustee Company Limited Level 4 |
|
Crawford Valley Trustee Company Limited Level 4 |
|
K One W One (no 3) Limited Level 4 |
|
Bota Limited Level 4 |
|
Aemg New Zealand Limited Level 4 |
|
Twp No.5 Limited Level 4 |
The Heritage Hotel Hanmer Springs Limited 35 Hobson Street |
Wellington Hotel Investments Limited Level 2 |
Vr Group Queen Street Limited Corner Of Church And Selwyn Streets |
Vr Group 2011 Limited Corner Of Church And Selwyn Streets |
Bayswater Management Services Limited Corner Of Church And Selwyn Streets |
120 Fanshawe Street Limited Corner Of Church And Selwyn Streets |