Waikaretu Wall Limited (NZBN 9429031750127) was started on 12 Jan 2010. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 39 Streamfields Way, Bombay, 2472 (type: registered, physical). 251 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pokeno had been their physical address, up until 18 May 2018. 1000 shares are issued to 6 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 250 shares (25% of shares), namely:
Fisher, Michol Janene (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Lynch, Noel Anthony (an individual) located at Freemans Bay, Auckland postcode 1011,
Jespersen, Ian Andrew (an individual) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Kuegler, Richard Craig (an individual) - located at Bombay,
Lynch, Noel Anthony (an individual) - located at Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Kuegler, Joanne Colleen (an individual) - located at Bombay. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 26 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
39 Streamfields Way, Bombay, 2472 | Registered & physical & service | 18 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michol Janene Fisher
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 12 Jan 2010 - current |
Richard Craig Kuegler
Bombay, 2472
Address used since 10 May 2018
Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472
Address used since 21 Mar 2011 |
Director | 12 Jan 2010 - current |
Joanne Colleen Kuegler
Bombay, 2472
Address used since 10 May 2018
Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472
Address used since 21 Mar 2011 |
Director | 12 Jan 2010 - current |
Noel Anthony Lynch
Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 23 Mar 2016 |
Director | 12 Jan 2010 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
251 Beaver Road, Rd 2, Pokeno, 2472 | Physical & registered | 29 Mar 2011 - 18 May 2018 |
164 Manukau Road, Pukekohe | Physical & registered | 12 Jan 2010 - 29 Mar 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fisher, Michol Janene Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Lynch, Noel Anthony Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Jespersen, Ian Andrew Individual |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kuegler, Richard Craig Individual |
Bombay 2472 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Lynch, Noel Anthony Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland 1011 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Kuegler, Joanne Colleen Individual |
Bombay 2472 |
12 Jan 2010 - current |
Blundell Concrete Products Limited 39 Streamfields Way |
|
Andrew Brown Builders Limited 39 Streamfields Way |
|
Streamfield Investments Limited 39 Streamfields Way |
|
H2 Holdings Limited 39 Streamfields Way |
|
Silver Fern Racing Limited 39 Streamfields Way |
|
Itb Services Limited 39 Streamfields Way |