Mt Macdonald Farm Limited (NZBN 9429031894715) was launched on 30 Jun 1970. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Mt Macdonald Farm, R D,, Hawarden, 7385 (type: physical, registered). Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 11 May 2018. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 98 shares (9.8% of shares), namely:
Clark-Hall, Robert Sam (an individual) located at Herne Bay, Auckland postcode 1011. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Clark-Hall, Amanda Jane (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Hawarden. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 0.1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Clark-Hall, Robert John, located at Rd 1, Hawarden (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Mt Macdonald Farm, R D,, Hawarden, 7385 | Physical & registered & service | 11 May 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Amanda Jane Clark-hall
R D, Hawarden 7385,
Address used since 03 May 2010 |
Director | 05 Mar 1991 - current |
Robert John Clark-hall
R D, Hawarden 7385,
Address used since 03 May 2010 |
Director | 14 Mar 1991 - current |
Robert Sam Clark-hall
522 Macdonald Downs Road, Hawarden, 7385
Address used since 28 Jun 2023
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 15 Dec 2021 |
Director | 15 Dec 2021 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, Amuri Park, 25 Churchill Street, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 11 May 2012 - 11 May 2018 |
Mcphail O'connell Brigden Ltd, Unit 23, Cavendish Business Park, 150 Cavendish Road, Christchurch, 8051 | Physical & registered | 01 Jun 2011 - 11 May 2012 |
Mcphail O'connell Brigden Ltd, Level 2, Bnz Building, 137 Armagh St, Christchurch 8011 | Registered & physical | 06 Aug 2009 - 01 Jun 2011 |
Mcphail And Co Ltd, Level 6, 137 Armagh St, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 20 Jun 2007 - 06 Aug 2009 |
137 Armagh Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 16 May 1997 - 20 Jun 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark-hall, Robert Sam Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
05 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark-hall, Amanda Jane Individual |
Rd 1 Hawarden 7385 |
19 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
Rd 1 Hawarden 7385 |
19 Jun 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Mcphail, Michael Allan Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 |
03 Jun 2021 - 20 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Robert John Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Amanda Jane Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Mcphail, Michael Allan Individual |
Christchurch 8011 |
30 Jun 1970 - 12 May 2021 |
Clark-hall, Amanda Jane Individual |
Hawarden Rd |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Amanda Jane Individual |
Hawarden Rd |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Clark-hall, Amanda Jane Individual |
R D Hawarden 7385 |
30 Jun 1970 - 23 Jun 2023 |
Mcphail, Michael Allan Individual |
Christchurch 8011 |
30 Jun 1970 - 12 May 2021 |
Loch Katrine NZ Society Incorporated 9 Gladstone Street |
|
Hawarden Golf Club Incorporated Hawarden Golf Club |
|
Sunflowers Preschool Limited 45 Seymour Street |
|
Hawarden-waikari Toy Library Incorporated 553 Hawarden-waikari Road |
|
The Dutch Station Limited 129 Bentleys Road |
|
Pitt Trustee Services Limited 288 Horsley Down Road |