Mansons Equity Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032046670) was registered on 07 Apr 1983. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: registered, physical). 72 St Georges Bay Road Parnell had been their registered address, up to 14 Nov 2001. Mansons Equity Limited used other names, namely: New Zealand Mortgage & Securities Co Limited from 07 Apr 1983 to 04 Dec 2012. 50000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 25000 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Manson, Edward Colin (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland postcode 1071. Our data was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Office & delivery | 16 Jun 2020 |
Po Box 37697, Parnell, Auckland, 1151 | Postal | 16 Jun 2020 |
74 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Edward Colin Manson
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 27 Jun 2011 |
Director | 14 Nov 1990 - current |
Culum Alexander Manson
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 08 Feb 2024
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 04 Feb 2022
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 15 Feb 2019
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 21 Jun 2017
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 14 Nov 2018 |
Director | 21 Jun 2017 - current |
Colin Maurice Manson
Herne Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 14 Nov 1990 |
Director | 14 Nov 1990 - 13 Jul 1998 |
74 St Georges Bay Road , Parnell , Auckland , 1052 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
72 St Georges Bay Road Parnell | Registered | 14 Nov 2001 - 14 Nov 2001 |
72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell | Registered | 14 Nov 2001 - 24 Jun 2020 |
72 St Georges Bay Road, Parnell | Physical | 06 Dec 2000 - 24 Jun 2020 |
72 St Georges Bay Road Parnell | Physical | 06 Dec 2000 - 06 Dec 2000 |
206a Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland | Physical | 01 Nov 1999 - 06 Dec 2000 |
206a Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland | Registered | 01 Nov 1999 - 14 Nov 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Manson, Edward Colin Individual |
St Heliers Auckland 1071 |
07 Apr 1983 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Manson, Colin Maurice (estate) Individual |
Auckland |
07 Apr 1983 - 13 Dec 2007 |
Ted Manson Community Trust 72 St Georges Bay Road |
|
Ted Manson Charitable Trust 72 St Georges Bay Road |
|
The Kelliher Charitable Trust Level 1 |
|
Garden To Table Limited 31-33 Ruskin Street |
|
Alter Industries Limited 2/62 St Georges Bay Rd |
|
Gordonhouse Lane Developments Limited 16 Ruskin Street |