Waytemore International Limited (issued a business number of 9429032078169) was incorporated on 30 Jul 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Bell Avenue, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1640 (type: registered, physical). 2001 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 4 entities and holds 1996 shares (99.75 per cent of shares), namely:
Foster, Paul Kenneth (an individual) located at Rd 5, Clevedon postcode 2585,
Mannering, Ricky John (an individual) located at Rd 3, Papakura postcode 2583,
Mannering, Shirley-Ann Carter (a director) located at Rd 3, Papakura postcode 2583. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.25 per cent of all shares (exactly 5 shares); it includes
Mannering, Shirley-Ann Carter (a director) - located at Rd 3, Papakura. Our database was updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Bell Avenue, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1640 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Jul 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shirley-ann Carter Mannering
Rd 3, Papakura, 2583
Address used since 26 Jan 2011 |
Director | 26 Jan 2011 - current |
Sir Richard Henry Alwyn Carter
1304b Ararimu Road, R D 3, Drury 2579,
Address used since 30 Jul 2009 |
Director | 30 Jul 2009 - 26 Jan 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Foster, Paul Kenneth Individual |
Rd 5 Clevedon 2585 |
31 Aug 2023 - current |
Mannering, Ricky John Individual |
Rd 3 Papakura 2583 |
29 Jul 2013 - current |
Mannering, Shirley-ann Carter Director |
Rd 3 Papakura 2583 |
07 Feb 2011 - current |
Ellwood, Dean Alan Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
30 Jul 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mannering, Shirley-ann Carter Director |
Rd 3 Papakura 2583 |
07 Feb 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carter, Sir Richard Henry Alwyn Individual |
1304b Ararimu Road R D 3, Drury 2579 |
30 Jul 2009 - 07 Feb 2011 |
Fleming, Thomas Christopher Howie Individual |
R D 3 Drury 2579 |
30 Jul 2009 - 31 Aug 2023 |
Carter, Sir Richard Henry Alwyn Individual |
1304b Ararimu Road R D 3, Drury 2579 |
30 Jul 2009 - 07 Feb 2011 |
Carter, June Doreen Individual |
Rd 3 Drury 2579 |
07 Feb 2011 - 29 Jul 2011 |
Rangataua Investments Limited 22 Bell Ave |
|
Ohutu Investments Limited 22 Bell Avenue |
|
Lumbercorp N.z. Limited 22 Bell Avenue |
|
Lumbercorp (bop) Limited 22 Bell Avenue |
|
Waytemore Investments Limited 22 Bell Avenue |
|
Anvil Horseshoes Limited 22 Bell Avenue |