Waterhole Swimming Centre Limited (NZBN 9429032094640) was launched on 28 Apr 1982. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 (type: registered, physical). Uhy Haines Norton (Auckland) Limited, 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland 0612 had been their registered address, up to 02 Oct 2008. 10669 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10669 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Wright, Judith Ann (an individual) located at Snells Beach, Snells Beach postcode 0920. The Businesscheck information was updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland, 0612 | Registered & physical & service | 02 Oct 2008 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Judith Ann Wright
Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920
Address used since 01 May 2018
Henderson, Auckland, 0612
Address used since 21 Jul 1989 |
Director | 21 Jul 1989 - current |
Gwynneth Betty Ryan
Snells Beach, Snells Beach, 0920
Address used since 01 May 2018
Henderson, Waitakere, 0612
Address used since 11 May 2010 |
Director | 30 Jun 2004 - current |
Clifford James Rae
Avondale, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Jul 1989 |
Director | 21 Jul 1989 - 30 Jun 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Uhy Haines Norton (auckland) Limited, 22 Catherine Street, Henderson, Auckland 0612 | Registered & physical | 02 Oct 2008 - 02 Oct 2008 |
Butts Bainbridge & Weir, 15 Edsel Street, Henderson, Auckland | Physical & registered | 24 Jun 2004 - 02 Oct 2008 |
Bdo Spicers, Level 8, 120 Albert, Auckland | Registered | 07 Mar 2003 - 24 Jun 2004 |
Bdo Spicers, Level 8, 120 Albert St, Auckland | Physical | 07 Mar 2003 - 24 Jun 2004 |
C/- B D O Spicers, 13th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs St West, Auckland | Physical | 06 Sep 2001 - 06 Sep 2001 |
B.d.o Spicers, Lvl 8, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert St, Auckland | Physical | 06 Sep 2001 - 07 Mar 2003 |
C/- B D O Spicers, 13th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland | Registered | 06 Sep 2001 - 07 Mar 2003 |
C/- Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 13th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs Street West, Auckland | Registered | 05 Apr 2001 - 06 Sep 2001 |
Bdo Hogg Young Cathie, 13th Floor, Quay Tower, 29 Customs St, Auckland | Physical | 05 Apr 2001 - 06 Sep 2001 |
130 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5 | Registered | 21 Apr 1995 - 05 Apr 2001 |
130 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5 | Registered | 20 Apr 1995 - 21 Apr 1995 |
123 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5 | Registered | 30 Nov 1992 - 20 Apr 1995 |
130 Main Highway, Ellerslie, Auckland 5 | Registered | 17 Jul 1991 - 30 Nov 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wright, Judith Ann Individual |
Snells Beach Snells Beach 0920 |
28 Apr 1982 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rae, Clifford James Individual |
Avondale Auckland |
28 Apr 1982 - 23 Mar 2005 |
Mongoose Group Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Hamburg Trustees Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Barbour Consulting Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Bbw Trustees (2004) Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
Reardon Electrical Limited 22 Catherine Street |
|
H & P Trading Group Limited Unit D, 150 Pioneer Plaza |