Foil Nz Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032232004) was registered on 20 May 2009. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: service, registered). 24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 14 Oct 2022. Foil Nz Limited used other names, namely: Moulton Trading Limited from 09 Oct 2009 to 27 Feb 2019, Creating The Edge New Zealand Limited (20 May 2009 to 09 Oct 2009). 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Moulton, Paul John (an individual) located at Orewa, Orewa postcode 0931. Businesscheck's data was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 18, Sap Tower, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Oct 2022 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 19 May 2023 |
Level 18, 151 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Service | 31 May 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul John Moulton
Browns Bay, Auckland, New Zealand, 0630
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Orewa, Orewa, 0931
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Browns Bay, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 20 May 2009 |
Director | 20 May 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
24-26 Pollen Street, Ponsonby, Auckland | Physical & registered | 20 May 2009 - 14 Oct 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moulton, Paul John Individual |
Orewa Orewa 0931 |
20 May 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Moulton, Sharon Patricia Individual |
Browns Bay North Shore City 0630 |
20 May 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Konings Ellis Limited Wither Tsang |
|
Healthy Heart Trustees Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Staff Independent Trustees Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Essence On St Heliers Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |
|
Franks Investments Limited 24-26 Pollen Street |