Buildfirst Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032317367) was launched on 31 Mar 2009. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 9 Shirley Road, Mairehau, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, service). 3 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 29 Aug 2023. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Sc Law Trustee Limited (an entity) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8011. Our database was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical | 19 Aug 2019 |
9 Shirley Road, Mairehau, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & service | 29 Aug 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Justin Thornley
St Albans, Christchurch, 8052
Address used since 04 Aug 2022
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 31 Jul 2014 |
Director | 31 Mar 2009 - current |
Ayeisha Thornley
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 19 Nov 2010 |
Director | 19 Nov 2010 - 20 Jul 2011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered | 25 Aug 2021 - 29 Aug 2023 |
44 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered | 19 Aug 2019 - 25 Aug 2021 |
44 Mandeville Street, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Service | 19 Aug 2019 - 29 Aug 2023 |
14b Leslie Hills Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 08 Aug 2014 - 19 Aug 2019 |
447a Blenheim Road, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 06 Mar 2014 - 08 Aug 2014 |
22 Dorset Street, Merivale, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & physical | 19 Aug 2013 - 06 Mar 2014 |
121 Papanui Road, Merivale, Christchurch, 8146 | Physical & registered | 07 Oct 2011 - 19 Aug 2013 |
3/25 Opawa Road, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 31 Mar 2009 - 07 Oct 2011 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sc Law Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046662828 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
27 Aug 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Good Fortune Trust Other |
31 Mar 2009 - 01 Sep 2016 | |
Gca Lawyers Trustees (14) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041081563 Company Number: 4937459 Entity |
22 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch 8011 |
01 Sep 2016 - 27 Aug 2020 |
Gca Lawyers Trustees (14) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041081563 Company Number: 4937459 Entity |
22 Moorhouse Avenue Christchurch 8011 |
01 Sep 2016 - 27 Aug 2020 |
Thornley, Justin Individual |
Riccarton Christchurch 8011 |
31 Mar 2009 - 01 Sep 2016 |
Null - The Good Fortune Trust Other |
31 Mar 2009 - 01 Sep 2016 |
Arrowfield 20 Limited 14b Leslie Hills Drive |
|
Waimairi School Centennial Trust 14 Leslie Hills Drive |
|
Contemporary Construction Limited 12 Leslie Hills Drive |
|
Oil Changers Botany Limited 12 Leslie Hills Drive |
|
North Canterbury Skin Cancer Clinic Limited 12 Leslie Hills Drive |
|
Marco Electronics Limited 12 Leslie Hills Drive |