Laaslows Industries Nz Limited (NZBN 9429032415742) was started on 04 Feb 2009. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Unit 1B, 129 Onewa Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 (type: physical, registered). 129 Onewa Road, Northcote, Auckland had been their registered address, until 23 Apr 2018. 1000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Fristaczki, Laszlo (an individual) located at Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland postcode 0610. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Fristaczki, Csilla Martin (an individual) - located at Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 31 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 1b, 129 Onewa Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Physical & registered & service | 23 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Laszlo Fristaczki
Te Atatu Peninsula, Auckland, 0610
Address used since 31 Oct 2023
Avondale, Auckland, 1026
Address used since 02 Nov 2015 |
Director | 04 Feb 2009 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
129 Onewa Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Registered & physical | 18 Nov 2013 - 23 Apr 2018 |
46 Bushlands Park Drive, Albany, North Shore City | Physical & registered | 04 Feb 2009 - 18 Nov 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fristaczki, Laszlo Individual |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 |
04 Feb 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fristaczki, Csilla Martin Individual |
Te Atatu Peninsula Auckland 0610 |
07 Jun 2013 - current |
Sol Y Sombra Tours Limited B1 / 129 Onewa Road |
|
Kylie Hounsell Limited B1 / 129 Onewa Road |
|
Hal Peter Carson Trustee Limited Unit 1b, 129 Onewa Road |
|
Kakara Estate Limited B1 / 129 Onewa Road |
|
Koroba Limited B1 / 129 Onewa Road |
|
Hal T&r Omega Trustee Limited B1 / 129 Onewa Road |