Gm Uni Trustee Company Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429032423136) was registered on 22 Jan 2009. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). 139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland had been their registered address, until 30 Nov 2015. Gm Uni Trustee Company Limited used more names, namely: Gnm Holdings 2009 Limited from 22 Jan 2009 to 03 Mar 2009. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Plus More Trustee 2022 Limited (an entity) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. Our database was last updated on 27 Apr 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 3, 27 Bath Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Nov 2015 |
Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & service | 21 Jun 2023 |
Level 5, 32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 01 Aug 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Daniel James Henderson
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 09 Aug 2018
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 20 Nov 2015 |
Director | 01 Apr 2013 - current |
Brendan Waters
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 09 Aug 2018
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 20 Nov 2015 |
Director | 22 Jan 2009 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Dilkhush Harry
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 22 Jan 2009 |
Director | 22 Jan 2009 - 09 May 2015 |
Allen Bertelsen
Shelly Park, Manukau, 2014
Address used since 22 Feb 2010 |
Director | 22 Jan 2009 - 01 Apr 2013 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
139 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical | 22 Jan 2009 - 30 Nov 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Plus More Trustee 2022 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050380237 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
01 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forefront Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036190256 Company Number: 1265260 Entity |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
22 Jan 2009 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Forefront Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036190256 Company Number: 1265260 Entity |
Parnell Auckland 1052 |
22 Jan 2009 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Effective Date | 21 Jul 1991 |
Name | Forefront Trustee Company Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 1265260 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Rmb Trading Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |
|
Pinnacle Commercial Estates Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |
|
Uniled Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |
|
New-b Plants Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |
|
Privateer Property Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |
|
The Addmore Group Limited Suite 3, 27 Bath Street |