Care On Call (Nz) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429032432824) was registered on 08 Jan 2009. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: Suite 1, Level 5, 55 Anzac Ave, City Centre, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical). Level 5,128 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 18 Jun 2018. Care On Call (Nz) Limited used other names, namely: North Shore Senior Care Limited from 08 Jan 2009 to 11 Jan 2011. 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Fleming, David Roberto (an individual) located at Westmere, Auckland postcode 1022. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Ngatapa Station Limited (an entity) - located at 188 Quay Street, Auckland. Businesscheck's database was updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4 Te Kea Place, North Harbour, Auckland, 0632 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 10 Apr 2014 |
Level 5, 128 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 04 Jul 2017 |
Suite1, Level 5, 55 Anzac Ave, City Centre, Auckland, 1023 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 08 Jun 2018 |
Suite 1, Level 5, 55 Anzac Ave, City Centre, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Jun 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Roberto Fleming
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 02 May 2014
Saint Marys Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 13 Sep 2019 |
Director | 09 Oct 2012 - current |
Antony Michael Czura
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 20 Jun 2017 |
Director | 20 Jun 2017 - current |
Antony Michael Czura
Devonport, Auckland, 0624
Address used since 21 Mar 2014 |
Director | 21 Mar 2014 - 08 Apr 2017 |
Gregory John Morris
Bayswater, 0622
Address used since 08 Jan 2009 |
Director | 08 Jan 2009 - 24 Mar 2014 |
Denise Frances Morris
Bayswater, 0622
Address used since 08 Jan 2009 |
Director | 08 Jan 2009 - 09 Oct 2012 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, Level 5, 55 Anzac Ave, City Centre, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Jun 2018 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 5,128 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 24 May 2017 - 18 Jun 2018 |
4 Te Kea Place, North Harbour, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 22 Apr 2014 - 24 May 2017 |
28 Queen Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 | Physical & registered | 02 Apr 2014 - 22 Apr 2014 |
103 Norwood Road, Bayswater | Physical & registered | 08 Jan 2009 - 02 Apr 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fleming, David Roberto Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
24 Oct 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ngatapa Station Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036708758 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
188 Quay Street Auckland 1010 |
25 Mar 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morris, Denise Frances Individual |
Bayswater |
08 Jan 2009 - 25 Mar 2014 |
Morris, Gregory John Individual |
Bayswater |
08 Jan 2009 - 25 Mar 2014 |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |