Morgan Shore Limited (NZBN 9429032567397) was started on 12 Sep 2008. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 34 Triton Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: office, physical). 34A Triton Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 09 Mar 2009. 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 4 entities and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Morgan, David Graham (an individual) located at Rd 3, Kaukapakapa postcode 0873,
Morgan, Kiri Louise (an individual) located at Rd 1, Kaukapakapa postcode 0871,
Morgan, Catherine Louisa (an individual) located at Kaukapakapa. "Property - non-residential - renting or leasing" (ANZSIC L671240) is the category the ABS issued to Morgan Shore Limited. Our database was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Triton Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Office | unknown |
Unit A2, 34 Triton Drive, Mairangi Bay | Physical & registered & service | 09 Mar 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Catherine Louisa Morgan
Kaukapakapa, 0871
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 12 Sep 2008 - current |
John James Morgan
Murrays Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Apr 2023
Paremoremo, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 01 Apr 2022
Hobsonville, Waitakere, 0618
Address used since 18 Mar 2010 |
Director | 12 Sep 2008 - current |
John Wilson Dashwood
Milford, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 01 Sep 2013 |
Director | 12 Sep 2008 - 27 Jul 2017 |
Graham John Morgan
Rd 1, Kaukapakapa, 0871
Address used since 01 Apr 2013 |
Director | 12 Sep 2008 - 01 Apr 2014 |
34 Triton Drive , Rosedale , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
34a Triton Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 19 Sep 2008 - 09 Mar 2009 |
31a Triton Drive, Mairangi Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 12 Sep 2008 - 19 Sep 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morgan, David Graham Individual |
Rd 3 Kaukapakapa 0873 |
02 Apr 2014 - current |
Morgan, Kiri Louise Individual |
Rd 1 Kaukapakapa 0871 |
12 Sep 2008 - current |
Morgan, Catherine Louisa Individual |
Kaukapakapa |
12 Sep 2008 - current |
Morgan, John James Individual |
Murrays Bay Auckland 0630 |
12 Sep 2008 - current |
Woori Accounting Limited Unit C, 34 Triton Drive |
|
Dhs Trustee Co. Limited Building C |
|
Champion Roofing Limited Building C |
|
Jr Consultant Limited Building C |
|
Orbit Trustees 2013 Limited Building C |
|
Harkin Marine Limited Building C |
Arif&z Limited 22 Denim Place |
Kodinali Consulting Limited 17 Capri Place |
Koco Limited Unit B1, 75 Corinthian Drive |
L & C Trustee Co Limited 10 Jonathan Place |
Uniserv Investments Limited 56 Tarndale Grove |
Mma Hobson Whanau Paparore Limited 97 Sycamore Drive |