Graceful Investment Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429032574777) was registered on 08 Sep 2008. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (type: registered, physical). 5 Newnham Terrace, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch had been their registered address, until 17 Feb 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Wong, Ren Jie (an individual) located at Northwood, Christchurch postcode 8051. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33 per cent of all shares (exactly 33 shares); it includes
Leow, Koon Bih (a director) - located at Northwood, Christchurch. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (12 shares, 12%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Leow, Jit Seng, located at Northwood, Christchurch (an individual). Businesscheck's database was updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Koon Bih Leow
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 08 Sep 2008 |
Director | 08 Sep 2008 - current |
Bih Koon Leow
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 08 Sep 2008 |
Director | 08 Sep 2008 - current |
Dean Ming Wong
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 25 May 2017 |
Director | 25 May 2017 - current |
Ren Jie Wong
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 26 Aug 2019 |
Director | 26 Aug 2019 - current |
David Ren Jie Wong
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 26 Aug 2019 |
Director | 26 Aug 2019 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Newnham Terrace, Upper Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 21 Feb 2014 - 17 Feb 2020 |
Ager Riley & Cocks, 124 St James Avenue, Christchurch, 8053 | Registered & physical | 06 Jul 2012 - 21 Feb 2014 |
Level 2,167 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 08 Sep 2008 - 06 Jul 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, Ren Jie Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
18 Apr 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leow, Koon Bih Director |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
22 Jun 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Leow, Jit Seng Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
08 Sep 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, Dean Ming Director |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
26 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wong, David Ren Ji Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
02 Sep 2019 - 12 Jun 2020 |
Wong, David Ren Jie Director |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
12 Jun 2020 - 18 Apr 2023 |
Leow, Bih Koon Individual |
Northwood Christchurch |
08 Sep 2008 - 22 Jun 2022 |
Leow, Bih Koon Individual |
Northwood Christchurch |
08 Sep 2008 - 22 Jun 2022 |
Leow, Dean Ming Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
10 Feb 2015 - 26 Aug 2019 |
Earl Investments Limited 5 Newnham Terrace |
|
Wigram Skies Vet Property Limited 5 Newnham Terrace |
|
Mt Michael Lodge Limited Partnership Ager, Riley & Cocks Chartered Accountant |
|
Stewart Island Smoked Salmon Limited 322 Riccarton Road |
|
Round 12 Tuam Street Limited 322 Riccarton Road |
|
Tuohy Associates (nz) Pty Limited Level 1 |